EP2300511 - AQUEOUS RADIATION CURABLE POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | 05.07.2019 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allnex Belgium S.A. Anderlechtstraat 33 1620 Drogenbos / BE | [2017/50] |
Former [2013/38] | For all designated states Allnex Belgium, S.A. Square Marie-Curie 11 1070 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Cytec Surface Specialties, S.A. Square Marie-Curie 11 1070 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HOLEN, Jurgen Beekstraatdries 9 B-9030 Mariakerke / BE | 02 /
CAPPELLE, Steven Okegembaan 141 B-9400 Ninove / BE | 03 /
DERUYTTERE, Xavier Pelikaanberg 10 B-1600 Sint-Pieters-Leeuw / BE | 04 /
TIELEMANS, Michel Avenue Roi Alert I 63 B-1780 Wemmel / BE | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Schoofs, Hilde, et al Allnex Belgium, S.A. Patent Department Anderlechtstraat 33 1620 Drogenbos / BE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Schoofs, Hilde, et al Cytec Surface Specialties, S.A. Patent Department Anderlechtstraat 33 B-1620 Drogenbos / BE | Application number, filing date | 09780196.3 | 06.07.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009EP58519 | Priority number, date | EP20080160100 | 10.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08160100 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010003924 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2300511 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2300511 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/73, C08F283/00, C08F290/06, C08F290/14, C08G18/34, C09D175/16, C08G18/67, C08G18/08 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
C08G18/673 (EP,CN,US);
C08L75/14 (KR);
B05D3/06 (US);
B32B27/40 (US);
C08F283/006 (EP,CN,US);
C08F283/008 (US);
C08F290/067 (EP,CN,US);
C08F290/147 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/12 (KR);
C08G18/348 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/67 (KR);
C08G18/73 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/10 (KR);
C09D175/14 (KR);
C09D175/16 (EP,CN,US);
B05D2201/02 (US);
B05D2203/20 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/673, C08G18/0823 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | C08G18/67, C08G18/08, C09D175/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE STRAHLENHÄRTBARE POLYURETHANZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2015/33] | English: | AQUEOUS RADIATION CURABLE POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS | [2011/13] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AQUEUSES DE POLYURÉTHANES DURCISSABLES PAR IRRADIATION | [2015/33] |
Former [2011/13] | STRAHLENHÄRTBARE WÄSSRIGE POLYURETHANZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | ||
Former [2011/13] | COMPOSITIONS AQUEUSES DE POLYURÉTHANE RADIODURCISSABLES | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 22.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2012
26.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67058 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02
25.10.2012
31.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG/ Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm Allee 60 / Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 51373 Leverkusen/40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2012
26.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67058 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02
25.10.2012
31.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG/ Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm Allee 60 / Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 51373 Leverkusen/40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative Levpat Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | |||
Former [2015/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2012
26.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67058 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02
25.10.2012
31.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH / Bayer MaterialScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Str10/Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 40789 Monheim / 51373 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Levpat Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | |||
Former [2015/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2012
26.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67058 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02
25.10.2012
31.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH / Bayer MaterialScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Str10/Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 40789 Monheim / 51373 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | |||
Former [2012/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2012
26.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67058 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02
25.10.2012
31.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel -Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | |||
Former [2012/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67058 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03.12.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.08.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.07.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.07.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.03.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/32] | 21.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 02.10.2015 | Appeal received No. T1655/15 | 02.12.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.03.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 21.08.2015 | Appeal received No. T1655/15 | 26.11.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.03.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 26.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2009 | AT | 25.01.2012 | BE | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | HR | 25.01.2012 | LT | 25.01.2012 | LV | 25.01.2012 | MK | 25.01.2012 | MT | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | SM | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | NO | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | IS | 25.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | IE | 06.07.2012 | LU | 06.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
SM | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US5596065 (GERLITZ MARTIN [AT], et al) [YD] 2,12 * examples 1,3,4; table 3 * * claim 1 *; | [XY]WO0200754 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-11,13-15 * page 5, line 39 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 4 * * page 9, lines 9-13 * * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 11 * * page 13, line 32 - page 14, line 1; example 1; claim - * [Y] 2,12; | [XY]DE102005008932 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-11,13-15 * paragraph [0136]; example -; claim - * [Y] 2,12; | [A]WO2007063025 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 29 * * page 5, lines 15-18 * * page 15, lines 24-42 * * page 22, lines 16-23 * * page 23, lines 1-18 ** page 37, lines 19-22; claim .- *; | [A]WO2008043722 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, lines 14-36 * * page 19, line 30 - page 20, line 5 * * page 26, lines 27-33 * * page 27, lines 23-27 * * page 28, line 4 - page 30, line 2 * * page 39, lines 16,17; example 6; claim - * |