Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2307358

EP2307358 - MIXTURES OF AMINES HAVING GUANIDINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2011
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/15]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2011/15]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DAUN, Gregor
Im Biengarten 29
69151 Neckargemünd / DE
02 / WITTENBECHER, Lars
Düsseldorfer Straße 12
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / HENNINGSEN, Michael
Tulpenstr.7
67227 Frankenthal / DE
04 / FLICK, Dieter
Anne - Frank - Str. 44
67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE
05 / GEISLER, Joerg-Peter
Frieda-Nadig-Straße 10a
55441 Bingen / DE
06 / SCHILLGALIES, Juergen
Kressenstraße 3
47445 Moers / DE
07 / JACOBI, Erhard
Schöne Aussicht 10
65510 Hünstetten / DE
 [2011/15]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/51](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date09780758.017.07.2009
[2011/15]
WO2009EP59210
Priority number, dateEP2008016085722.07.2008         Original published format: EP 08160857
WO2009EP5870008.07.2009         Original published format: PCT/EP2009/058700
[2011/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010010045
Date:28.01.2010
Language:DE
[2010/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2307358
Date:13.04.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010
[2011/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2307358
Date:21.12.2011
Language:DE
[2011/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07C279/00
[2011/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/15]
TitleGerman:MISCHUNGEN VON AMINEN MIT GUANIDIN-DERIVATEN[2011/15]
English:MIXTURES OF AMINES HAVING GUANIDINE DERIVATIVES[2011/15]
French:MÉLANGES D AMINES ET DE DÉRIVÉS DE LA GUANIDINE[2011/15]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2011National basic fee paid 
22.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/15]
12.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2011Fee for grant paid
03.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.09.2012  26.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Hexion Inc.
12650 Directors Drive Suite 100
Stafford, TX 77477 / US
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 02  20.09.2012  25.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Operations GmbH
Rellinghauser Straße 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [2019/52]
Former [2015/32]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2012  26.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Hexion Inc.
12650 Directors Drive Suite 100
Stafford, TX 77477 / US
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 02  20.09.2012  25.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11
45128 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2014/07]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2012  26.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Momentive Specialty Chemicals Inc.
12650 Directors Drive Suite 100
Stafford, Texas 77477 / US
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 02  20.09.2012  25.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11
45128 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2013/39]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2012  26.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Momentive Specialty Chemicals Inc.
12650 Directors Drive Suite 100
Stafford, Texas 77477 / US
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 02  20.09.2012  25.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11
45128 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2012/44]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2012  26.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Momentive Specialty Chemicals Inc.
12650 Directors Drive Suite 100
Stafford, Texas 77477 / US
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 02  20.09.2012  25.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11
45128 Essen / DE
29.10.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.03.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
11.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.05.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1634/16
19.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
MK21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
SM21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
LU17.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
AT17.07.2014
FI17.07.2016
HR17.07.2016
LT17.07.2016
LV17.07.2016
SK17.07.2016
HU18.07.2016
SI18.07.2016
EE31.07.2016
[2017/26]
Former [2015/51]CY21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
MK21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
SM21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
LU17.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
AT17.07.2014
Former [2014/27]CY21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
MK21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
SM21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
LU17.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/35]CY21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
MK21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2012/35]CY21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/34]CY21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/28]CY21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/24]GR22.03.2012
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO2004020506  (HUNTSMAN SPEC CHEM CORP [US], et al) [DX] 1-13 * example 1; claims 1-5 *;
 [DX]WO0242349  (SCHILE RICHARD D [US]) [DX] 1-13 * examples I,II; claims 1-26 *;
 [X]WO03045801  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * examples 1-19; claims 1-23 *;
 [X]WO03002667  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-13 * examples 1-4; claims 1-39 *;
 [X]WO02070623  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * examples 1-17; claims 1-30 *
by applicantWO2004020506
 WO03045801
 WO03002667
 WO02070623