Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2313872

EP2313872 - METHOD FOR TESTING THE AUTHENTICITY OF A DOCUMENT, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT, TESTING EQUIPMENT AND DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.01.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstraße 91
10958 Berlin / DE
[2011/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ALHEIT, Reimund
Lindenstraße 11
16775 Stechlin-Menz / DE
02 / KESSLER, Horst
Franzensbader Straße 35
14193 Berlin / DE
03 / SPRENGER, Martin
Planufer 92 E
10967 Berlin / DE
04 / KRAMER, Christian
Kattegatstraße 24
13359 Berlin / DE
05 / DIETRICH, Jürgen
Wendenschloßstraße 297
12557 Berlin / DE
 [2011/17]
Representative(s)Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Wilhelmstraße 7
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/17]Richardt Patentanwälte
Wilhelmstraße 7
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date09780856.221.07.2009
[2011/17]
WO2009EP59332
Priority number, dateDE2008104111308.08.2008         Original published format: DE102008041113
[2011/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010015506
Date:11.02.2010
Language:DE
[2010/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2313872
Date:27.04.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010
[2011/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:G07D7/00
[2011/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR PRÜFUNG DER ECHTHEIT EINES DOKUMENTS, COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT, PRÜFGERÄT UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM[2011/17]
English:METHOD FOR TESTING THE AUTHENTICITY OF A DOCUMENT, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT, TESTING EQUIPMENT AND DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM[2011/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR VÉRIFIER L'AUTHENTICITÉ D'UN DOCUMENT, PRODUIT PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE, APPAREIL DE CONTRÔLE ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES[2011/17]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2011National basic fee paid 
08.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/17]
25.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
13.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.11.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination21.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0922/16
11.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
22.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2006078186  (FREEMAN ET AL.) [X] 1-4,6-13 * paragraphs [0042] - [0044] - [0049] - [0051] - [0054] , [0101] , [0102]; figures 1-4 * [A] 5;
 [XA]WO2004107278  (ASTROSYS INTERNATIONAL LTD) [X] 1-4,6,8-13 * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, line 3 * * page 8, line 25 - page 11, line 4 * * page 11, paragraph L; figure - * [A] 5,7;
 [XA]EP1883053  (RICOH COMPANY LTD.) [X] 1,4-7,9-13 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0010] , [0012] , [0013] , [0040] , [0045] - [0049] - [0051] , [0052] , [0062] - [0066] - [0071] - [0075] - [0081] - [0086] - [0146]; figures 1-5,12 * [A] 2;
 [XA]US5652802  (GRAVES ET AL.) [X] 1,4,6,8-13 * column 11, line 1 - line 6 * * column 17, line 51 - column 19, line 9 * * column 22, line 13 - line 67; figures 4,5,7-10,15 * [A] 2,5,7