Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2328918

EP2328918 - MUTANT ALPHA-SYNUCLEIN, AND METHODS USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.05.2015
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
[2015/24]
Former [2011/23]For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
Former [2011/23]For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Hofgartenstraße 8
80539 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ZWECKSTETTER, Markus
Wilhelm-Raabe-Str. 22
37083 Göttingen / DE
02 / KARPINAR, Pinar
Tarabya Bayiri Caddesi Sanatcilar Sitesi 25-A
Blok No.: 22
34457 Tarabya Sariyer Istanbul / TR
03 / GRIESINGER, Christian
Hainholzweg 74
37085 Göttingen / DE
 [2011/37]
Former [2011/23]01 / ZWECKSTETTER, Markus
Friedrich-Jenner-Straße 12
37085 Göttingen / DE
02 / KARPINAR, Pinar
Immanuel-Kant-Straße 32
37083 Göttingen / DE
03 / GRIESINGER, Christian
Hainholzweg 74
37085 Göttingen / DE
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2015/24]
Former [2011/23]Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date09781633.407.08.2009
[2011/23]
WO2009EP60299
Priority number, dateEP2008016205608.08.2008         Original published format: EP 08162056
[2011/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010015714
Date:11.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2328918
Date:08.06.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010
[2011/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2328918
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:A01K67/027, A01K67/033, C12N15/10, C07K14/47
[2017/50]
Former International [2011/23]C07K14/47, C12N15/12, C12N5/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2011/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:MUTANTES ALPHA-SYNUKLEIN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/50]
English:MUTANT ALPHA-SYNUCLEIN, AND METHODS USING SAME[2011/23]
French:ALPHA-SYNUCLÉINES MUTANTES, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION[2014/50]
Former [2011/23]MUTIERTES ALPHA-SYNUCLEIN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN ANWENDUNG
Former [2011/23]ALPHA-SYNUCLÉINE MUTANTE, ET SES MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase07.03.2011National basic fee paid 
07.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/23]
23.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2015Fee for grant paid
29.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.03.2016  14.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Then, Christoph / Tippe, Ruth / Hamberger, Sylvia
Frohschammerstrasse 14
80807 München / DE
 [2016/16]
14.04.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.11.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0186/18
14.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.08.2009
AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MK10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
SM10.06.2015
TR10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]HU07.08.2009
AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
SM10.06.2015
TR10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2017/03]AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/24]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/21]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0018917  (AMGEN INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 7; figure 7 *;
 [A]WO2005108423  (ATGEN CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] * page 34; sequence 15 *
 [Y]  - KOO ET AL, "Sequence determinants regulating fibrillation of human alpha-synuclein", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20080207), vol. 368, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 772 - 778, XP022504669 [Y] 1-15 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2008.01.140
 [Y]  - BERTONCINI CARLOS W ET AL, "Release of long-range tertiary interactions potentiates aggregation of natively unstructured alpha-synuclein", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20050201), vol. 102, no. 5, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1430 - 1435, XP002510525 [Y] 1-15 * page 1434, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0407146102
 [A]  - BEYER KATRIN ET AL, "The therapeutical potential of alpha-synuclein antiaggregatory agents for dementia with Lewy bodies", CURRENT MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, BE, (20080101), vol. 15, no. 26, ISSN 0929-8673, pages 2748 - 2759, XP009110439
Opposition   - BAILY, J., "Man Or Mouse, Genetically Modified Animals", Medical Research, A Critical Review, Animal Aid, (20050000), XP055275801
    - BAILY, J., "Monkey-based Research on Human Disease: The Implications of Genetic Differences", ATLA, (20140000), vol. 42, pages 287 - 317, XP055275698
    - THEN C, "Stop investment in animal suffering', Patents on animals and new methods in genetic engineering: Economic interests leading to an increasing number of animal experiments", HYPERLINK, (20150000), URL: http://www.testbiotech.org/node/1266''www.testbiotech.org/node/1266, XP055275699
    - ARIANNE FERRARI A, gentechnisch veränderte Tiere in der Biomedizin, (20080000), pages 60 - 108, XP055275803
    - VAN REENEN et al., "Transgenesis may affect farm animal welfare: a case for systematic risk assessment", JAnim Sci, (20010000), vol. 79, pages 1763 - 1779, XP055275805
    - "Ergebnis einer Umfrage aus dem Jahr 2009", Schmerzen oder Leiden bei Tierarten wie Primaten, Hunden und Katzen hervorzurufen,