Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2328748

EP2328748 - CLAD AUTOMOTIVE SHEET PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.03.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2017New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novelis, Inc.
191 Evans Avenue
Toronto, ON M8Z 1J5 / CA
[2011/23]
Inventor(s)01 / TIMM, Juergen
Schorenstrasse 4
78256 Steisslingen / DE
02 / BASSI, Corrado
Ferrachenstrasse 13
CH-3970 Salgesch / CH
 [2011/26]
Former [2011/23]01 / TIMM, Juergen
Schorenstrasse 4
78256 Steisslingen / DE
02 / BASSI, Corrado
Route do Muzot 4
CH-3986 Veyras / CH
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]Dey, Michael , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
Former [2012/05]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2011/23]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date09781694.611.08.2009
[2011/23]
WO2009EP60370
Priority number, dateEP2008016229813.08.2008         Original published format: EP 08162298
[2011/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010018161
Date:18.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2328748
Date:08.06.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010
[2011/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2328748
Date:01.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:B32B15/01, C22C21/02, C22C21/08
[2011/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/23]
TitleGerman:PLATTIERTES KRAFTFAHRZEUGBLECHPRODUKT[2011/23]
English:CLAD AUTOMOTIVE SHEET PRODUCT[2011/23]
French:TÔLE PLAQUÉE POUR AUTOMOBILE[2011/23]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2011National basic fee paid 
25.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/23]
29.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2011Fee for grant paid
14.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.08.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.10.2012  06.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
AMAG rolling GmbH
Lamprechtshausenerstrasse 61
5282 Braunau am Inn-Ranshofen / AT
Opponent's representative
Jell, Friedrich
Bismarckstrasse 9
4020 Linz / AT
 02  31.10.2012  06.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Hydro Aluminium Rolled Products GmbH
Aluminiumstrasse 1
41515 Grevenbroich / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  31.10.2012  09.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Aleris Aluminum Duffel BVBA
A. Stocletlaan 87
2570 DUFFEL / BE
Opponent's representative
Schinkel, Reta
Müller Schupfner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
 [2016/40]
Former [2012/50]
Opponent(s)01  31.10.2012  06.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
AMAG rolling GmbH
Lamprechtshausenerstrasse 61
5282 Braunau am Inn-Ranshofen / AT
Opponent's representative
Jell, Friedrich
Bismarckstrasse 9
4020 Linz / AT
 02  31.10.2012  06.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Hydro Aluminium Rolled Products GmbH
Aluminiumstrasse 1
41515 Grevenbroich / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  31.10.2012  09.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Aleris Aluminum Duffel BVBA
A. Stocletlaan 87
2570 DUFFEL / BE
Opponent's representative
Schinkel, Reta
Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
11.12.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.06.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.03.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition24.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1134/17
24.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
08.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1134/17
20.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.08.2009
AT01.02.2012
BE01.02.2012
CY01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
MK01.02.2012
MT01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SI01.02.2012
SM01.02.2012
TR01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
IE11.08.2012
LU11.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2014/34]HU11.08.2009
AT01.02.2012
BE01.02.2012
CY01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
MT01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SI01.02.2012
SM01.02.2012
TR01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
IE11.08.2012
LU11.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/27]AT01.02.2012
BE01.02.2012
CY01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
MT01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SI01.02.2012
SM01.02.2012
TR01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
IE11.08.2012
LU11.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/21]AT01.02.2012
BE01.02.2012
CY01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
MT01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SI01.02.2012
TR01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
IE11.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/20]AT01.02.2012
BE01.02.2012
CY01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
MT01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SI01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
IE11.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2013/51]AT01.02.2012
BE01.02.2012
CY01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
MT01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SI01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
IE11.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/33]AT01.02.2012
BE01.02.2012
CY01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SI01.02.2012
BG01.05.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
IE11.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2012/49]BE01.02.2012
CY01.02.2012
DK01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
RO01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
SI01.02.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/48]BE01.02.2012
CY01.02.2012
EE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
SE01.02.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/41]BE01.02.2012
CY01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/39]BE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
LV01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/37]BE01.02.2012
FI01.02.2012
HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
PL01.02.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
PT01.06.2012
Former [2012/36]HR01.02.2012
LT01.02.2012
NO01.05.2012
GR02.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT01.02.2012
NO01.05.2012
IS01.06.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1852250  (ALERIS ALUMINUM DUFFEL BVBA [BE]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0018] , [0024] - [0028] *;
 [A]EP1170118  (PECHINEY RHENALU [FR]) [A] 1-16 * claim 1 *;
 [AD]JP2000129382  (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al) [AD] 1-16 * abstract *
by applicantWO2007128391