Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2328748 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2328748



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1190
21.01.2020 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 4
17.01.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.06.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
05.12.2017 Claims Appeal 2
05.12.2017 Claims Appeal 3
05.12.2017 Claims Appeal 2
05.12.2017 Claims Appeal 2
05.12.2017 Claims Appeal 2
05.12.2017 Drawings Appeal 2
05.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.12.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 19
28.07.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
24.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
24.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 22
24.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 15
24.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
24.07.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
20.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
20.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 20
20.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
20.07.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.07.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
31.05.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
31.05.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
24.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
24.05.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.05.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
09.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.05.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
08.05.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
14.03.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
14.03.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 24
14.03.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.11.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
20.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
26.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
25.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Claims Opposition 3
19.05.2016 Claims Opposition 3
19.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 18
04.03.2016 Document concerning representation Opposition 4
21.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
15.12.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.12.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Opposition 1
26.03.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
25.03.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 3
24.03.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
13.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
11.03.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
03.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
19.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
11.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
09.02.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 4
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
25.04.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
10.04.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
19.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
06.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
01.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.07.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
19.06.2013 Description Opposition 11
19.06.2013 Drawings Opposition 5
19.06.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
19.06.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 3
24.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.04.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.11.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
05.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
05.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
05.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 60
05.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
05.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
05.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
31.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
31.10.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
31.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
31.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
31.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
31.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
31.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
31.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
31.10.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
31.10.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
31.10.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
31.10.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
31.10.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 60
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
31.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
09.05.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
09.05.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
05.01.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.12.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.12.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
14.12.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.08.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
29.08.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.08.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.08.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
18.05.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
11.05.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.05.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
19.04.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
12.04.2011 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
25.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
25.02.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
22.12.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.12.2010 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.12.2010 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.12.2010 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.12.2010 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.12.2010 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.12.2010 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.12.2010 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.12.2010 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.05.2010 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
29.04.2010 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.04.2010 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2010 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
10.03.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
18.02.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.02.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 16
03.11.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.11.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.11.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
11.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
11.08.2009 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
11.08.2009 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
11.08.2009 Description PCT receiving Office 11
11.08.2009 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2
11.08.2009 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 18