Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2328748


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.01.2020 Change: Appeal number
25.07.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
21.07.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
30.05.2017 New entry: Appeal number
30.05.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
30.05.2017 Deletion: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
30.05.2017 Deletion: Appeal number
26.05.2017 New entry: Appeal number
26.05.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
15.05.2017 Change: Appeal number
10.05.2017 New entry: Appeal number
10.05.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
13.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
02.09.2016 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  05.10.2016  [2016/40]
14.12.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
24.03.2015 Change - representative
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
30.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
18.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
11.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
15.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
12.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
28.06.2013 Change - representative published on  31.07.2013  [2013/31]
21.06.2013 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
21.06.2013 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.04.2013 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
10.12.2012 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
09.11.2012 Opposition filed published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
02.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
26.10.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.11.2012  [2012/48]
07.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2012  [2012/41]
24.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2012  [2012/39]
10.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
03.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2012  [2012/36]
20.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2012  [2012/34]
30.12.2011 (Expected) grant published on  01.02.2012  [2012/05]
21.12.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.12.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
31.08.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.08.2011 Change - extension states published on  21.09.2011  [2011/38]
18.08.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.05.2011 Change - inventor published on  29.06.2011  [2011/26]
06.05.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.06.2011  [2011/23]
06.05.2011 Request for examination filed published on  08.06.2011  [2011/23]
27.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
04.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
21.05.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
19.02.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication