Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2328748 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP08162298 EP09781694



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9193134Global Dossier 24.11.2015B2
US2015072169 12.03.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
US201113055910 16.03.2011
US201414546044 18.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8940406Global Dossier 27.01.2015B2
US2011165437 07.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101651602BGlobal Dossier 26.08.2016B1
KR20150106010 18.09.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101554259BGlobal Dossier 18.09.2015B1
KR20110044993 03.05.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5432262BGlobal Dossier 05.03.2014B2
JP2011530657 22.12.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2731669Global Dossier 06.10.2015C
CA2731669 18.02.2010A1
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2328748Global Dossier 01.02.2012B1
EP2328748 08.06.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP09781694 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT543640T 15.02.2012T
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0917981 02.07.2019B1
BRPI0917981 17.11.2015A2
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102119078 06.07.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105483466 13.04.2016A
Priority number Date
EP08162298 13.08.2008
CN200980131346 11.08.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2378505T 13.04.2012T3
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2011000935 29.03.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009EP60370 11.08.2009
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010018161Global Dossier 18.02.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2156945Global Dossier 24.02.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP08162298 13.08.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2011109160 20.09.2012A
Priority number Date
EP08162298 13.08.2008