Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2335195

EP2335195 - ELECTRONIC BUSINESS POSTAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Church, Liam
25 Camden Row Dublin 8
Dublin / IE
For all designated states
Higgins, Fionnuala
25 Camden Row Dublin 8
Dublin / IE
[2011/25]
Inventor(s)01 / CHURCH, Liam
25 Camden Row
Dublin 8 / IE
02 / HIGGINS, Fionnuala
25 Camden Row
Dublin 8 / IE
03 / FLEMING David James
1 Yachtsman's Point
Brittas Road
Wicklow Town / IE
 [2011/41]
Former [2011/25]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Hargreaves, Timothy Edward
Marks & Clerk LLP
40 Torphichen Street
Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/25]Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 48
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date09783613.430.09.2009
[2011/25]
WO2009EP62712
Priority number, dateUS20080101200P30.09.2008         Original published format: US 101200 P
US2009056946529.09.2009         Original published format: US 569465
[2011/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010037792
Date:08.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/14]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2335195
Date:22.06.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2010
[2011/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, G06Q50/00
[2011/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/25]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHES UNTERNEHMENS-POSTSYSTEM[2011/25]
English:ELECTRONIC BUSINESS POSTAL SYSTEM[2011/25]
French:SYSTÈME POSTAL DE COMMERCE ÉLECTRONIQUE[2011/25]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2011National basic fee paid 
03.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/25]
30.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination15.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1158/17
18.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007073943  (REGIFY GMBH I G [DE]; SCHMID VOLKER [DE]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6473407  (DITMER CHRISTINE M [US] ET AL) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2008065346  (IRVINE DAVID [GB]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2007005717  (LEVASSEUR THIERRY [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *