Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2348838

EP2348838 - AN ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC, A Company Registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424
Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever NV
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC, A Company Registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424
Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
Former [2011/31]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever NV
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC, A Company Registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424
Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CHAKRABORTTY, Amit
Hindustan Unilever Ltd
Research Centre
64 Main Road
Whitefield P.O. Bangalore 560 066 / IN
02 / MEDEPALLI, Srilaxmi, V
Hindustan Unilever Ltd
Research Centre
64 Main Road
Whitefield P.O. Bangalore 560 066 / IN
 [2013/19]
Former [2011/31]01 / CHAKRABORTTY, Amit
Hindustan Unilever Ltd Research Centre 64 Main Road
Whitefield P.O. Bangalore 560 066 / IN
02 / MEDEPALLI, Srilaxmi, V
Hindustan Unilever Ltd Research Centre 64 Main Road
Whitefield P.O. Bangalore 560 066 / IN
Representative(s)van den Brom, Coenraad Richard
Unilever Patent Group
Bronland 14
6708 WH Wageningen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Acham, Nicholas Clive
Unilever NV Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2011/31]Acham, Nicholas Clive
Unilever NV Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date09783843.708.10.2009
[2011/31]
WO2009EP63081
Priority number, dateIN2008MUM225420.10.2008         Original published format: IN MU22542008
[2011/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010046238
Date:29.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2348838
Date:03.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010
[2011/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2348838
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:A01N31/04, A01N31/06, A01N31/08, A61K8/34, A61L12/14, A61Q11/00, C11D3/00, A61Q17/00, C11D3/20, C11D3/48
[2013/11]
Former International [2011/31]A01N31/04, A01N31/06, A01N31/08, A61K8/34, A61L12/14, A61Q11/00, C11D3/00, A61Q17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTIMIKROBIELLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2011/31]
English:AN ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITION[2011/31]
French:COMPOSITION ANTIMICROBIENNE[2011/31]
Entry into regional phase15.03.2011National basic fee paid 
15.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
15.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/31]
27.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2013Fee for grant paid
27.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.02.2014  11.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
BEIERSDORF AG
Unnastrasse 48
D-20245 HAMBURG / DE
Opponent's representative
Uexküll & Stolberg, et al
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
 02  07.02.2014  21.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/12]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2014  11.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
BEIERSDORF AG
Unnastrasse 48
D-20245 HAMBURG / DE
Opponent's representative
UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
 02  07.02.2014   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
20.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
04.03.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition28.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1083/16
05.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
02.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
LU08.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
LU08.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2015/32]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2015/24]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2014/48]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2014/34]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2014/25]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/52]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2008017484  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1 * examples 1,3 *;
 [X]WO2007125216  (WESTRAND INTERNAT SARL [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,8-9 * page 11, line 18 - page 12, line 19 *;
 [X]WO0170215  (BOECK HARRY [AU]) [X] 1 * claims 2-5 *;
 [AD]US5965518  (NAKATSU TETSUO [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * column 3, line 26 - line 45; claim -; table - *