Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2485864

EP2485864 - CONTROLLING RULES AND VARIABLES FOR CUTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.06.2014
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tomologic AB
Teknikringen 33
114 28 Stockholm / SE
[2012/33]
Inventor(s)01 / NORBERG OHLSSON, Magnus
Hällum Skogshagen
S-534 95 Vara / SE
 [2012/33]
Representative(s)Zacco Sweden AB , et al
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]Bjerndell, Per Ingvar , et al
Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Former [2012/33]Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje
Groth & Co KB Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date09783865.008.10.2009
WO2009EP63122
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011042058
Date:14.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2485864
Date:15.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011
[2012/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2485864
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:B23K26/38
[2012/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERREGELN UND -VARIABLEN FÜR SCHNEIDVERFAHREN[2012/33]
English:CONTROLLING RULES AND VARIABLES FOR CUTTING[2012/33]
French:RÈGLES ET VARIABLES DE COMMANDE POUR DÉCOUPAGE[2012/33]
Entry into regional phase08.05.2012National basic fee paid 
08.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/33]
09.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2014Fee for grant paid
18.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.04.2015  07.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
TRUMPF Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH + Co. KG
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
 02  10.04.2017  25.04.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Bystronic Laser AG
Industriestrasse 21
CH-3362 Niederönz / CH
Opponent's representative
Rosenich, Paul
Rotenbodenstrasse 12
9497 Triesenberg / LI
 [2017/35]
Former [2017/23]
Opponent(s)01  29.04.2015  07.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
TRUMPF Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH + Co. KG
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
 02  10.04.2017  10.04.2017  INTERVENTION
Bystronic Laser AG
Industriestrasse 21
CH-3362 Niederönz / CH
Opponent's representative
Rosenich, Paul
Rotenbodenstrasse 12
9497 Triesenberg / LI
Former [2017/22]
Opponent(s)01  29.04.2015  07.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
TRUMPF Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH + Co. KG
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
 02  10.04.2017  10.04.2017  INTERVENTION
Bystronic Laser AG
Industriestrasse 21
CH-3362 Niederönz / CH
Opponent's representative
Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG
BGZ
Rotenbodenstrasse 12
9497 Triesenberg / LI
Former [2017/20]
Opponent(s)01  29.04.2015  07.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
TRUMPF Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH + Co. KG
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
 02  10.04.2017   
Bystronic Laser AG
Industriestrasse 21
CH-3362 Niederönz / CH
Opponent's representative
Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG
BGZ
Rotenbodenstrasse 12
9497 Triesenberg / LI
Former [2015/23]
Opponent(s)01  29.04.2015   
TRUMPF Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH + Co. KG
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
08.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07)
23.12.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Stay/Interruption10.05.2017Stay of proceedings
[2017/26]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MK30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/22]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/20]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/12]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
DE01.05.2015
Former [2015/50]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
DE01.05.2015
Former [2015/38]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
FR31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
DE01.05.2015
Former [2015/36]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
DE01.05.2015
Former [2015/35]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
DE01.05.2015
Former [2015/27]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/26]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
LU08.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/10]LT30.07.2014
NO30.10.2014
Former [2015/08]LT30.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2189179  (SCINTILLA AG) [A] 1,22 * page 1, line 7 - page 1, line 75; figure 1; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]EP1563940  (FAGAN MATTHEW [AU]) [A] 1-3,21-24,42 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-3; claims 1-38 *;
 [A]DE10129751  (WHITNEY CO W [US]) [A] 1,22,43 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0080]; figures 1-9; claims 1-42 *