Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2337923

EP2337923 - FLEXIBLE PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.11.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NO
published on 23.05.2018  [2018/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Oil & Gas UK Limited
2, High Street
Nailsea Bristol
BS48 1BS / GB
[2014/51]
Former [2011/34]For all designated states
Wellstream International Limited
Wellstream House Wincomblee Road Walker Riverside
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE6 3PF / GB
Former [2011/26]For all designated states
Wellstream International Limited
Wellstream House Wincomblee Road Walker Riverside
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE6 3PF / GB
For all designated states
Barros, Claudio Cezario De
Av. Rio Branco No 138-11° Andar, Centro
CEP-20040-002 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
For all designated states
Goes, Rafael
Av. Rio Branco No 138-11° Andar, Centro
CEP-20040-002 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
Inventor(s)01 / BARROS, Claudio Cezario de
Wellstream International Limited
Av. Rio Branco No 138-11° Andar
Centro
CEP-20040-002 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
02 / GOES, Rafael
Wellstream International Limited
Av. Rio Branco No 138-11° Andar
Centro
CEP-20040-002 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
03 / CLEVELARIO, Judimar de Assis
Wellstream International Limited
Av. Rio Branco No 138-11° Andar
Centro
CEP-20040-002 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
04 / PIRES, Fabio de Souza
Wellstream International Limited
Av. Rio Branco No 138-11° Andar
Centro
CEP-20040-002 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
 [2012/49]
Former [2011/26]01 / BARROS, Claudio Cezario de
Wellstream International Limited Av. Rio Branco No 138-11° Andar Centro
CEP-20040-002 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
02 / GOES, Rafael
Wellstream International Limited Av. Rio Branco No 138-11° Andar Centro
CEP-20040-002 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
03 / CLEVELARIO, Judimar de Assis
Wellstream International Limited Av. Rio Branco No 138-11° Andar Centro
CEP-20040-002 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
04 / PIRES, Fabio de Souza
Wellstream International Limited Av. Rio Branco No 138-11° Andar Centro
CEP-20040-002 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/49]Harrison Goddard Foote
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York
YO1 8NQ / GB
Former [2011/26]Harrison Goddard Foote
106 Micklegate York
YO1 6JX / GB
Application number, filing date09785490.514.08.2009
[2011/26]
WO2009GB51023
Priority number, dateGB2008001850009.10.2008         Original published format: GB 0818500
[2011/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010041048
Date:15.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2337923
Date:29.06.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010
[2011/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2337923
Date:05.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:E21B19/00, F16L11/08, F16L11/133, E21B17/01
[2017/14]
Former International [2011/26]E21B17/01
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/26]
TitleGerman:SCHLAUCH[2011/26]
English:FLEXIBLE PIPE[2011/26]
French:TUYAU SOUPLE[2011/26]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2011National basic fee paid 
13.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/26]
28.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2012Fee for grant paid
24.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.06.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.09.2013  10.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Technip France
6-8, Allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche, ZAC Danton
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 [2016/35]
Former [2013/41]
Opponent(s)01  04.09.2013   
Technip France
6-8, Allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche, ZAC Danton
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Colombié, Damien
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Etienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
14.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.04.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
21.03.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition31.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1254/17
31.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1254/17
20.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.08.2009
AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
GR05.12.2012
IT05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
MC05.12.2012
MK05.12.2012
MT05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
SM05.12.2012
TR05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
HR31.07.2013
IE14.08.2013
LU14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
DE01.03.2014
NO31.08.2017
[2018/21]
Former [2015/38]HU14.08.2009
AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
GR05.12.2012
IT05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
MC05.12.2012
MK05.12.2012
MT05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
SM05.12.2012
TR05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
HR31.07.2013
IE14.08.2013
LU14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
DE01.03.2014
Former [2015/34]HU14.08.2009
AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
IT05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
MC05.12.2012
MK05.12.2012
MT05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
SM05.12.2012
TR05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
HR31.07.2013
IE14.08.2013
LU14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
DE01.03.2014
Former [2015/32]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
IT05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
MC05.12.2012
MK05.12.2012
MT05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
SM05.12.2012
TR05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
HR31.07.2013
IE14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
DE01.03.2014
Former [2015/24]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
IT05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
MC05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
SM05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
HR31.07.2013
IE14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
DE01.03.2014
Former [2014/33]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
IT05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
MC05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
HR31.07.2013
IE14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
DE01.03.2014
Former [2014/22]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
IT05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
MC05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
HR31.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
DE01.03.2014
Former [2014/20]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
IT05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
MC05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
HR31.07.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
IT05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
HR31.07.2013
Former [2014/03]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
IT05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
Former [2013/52]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
Former [2013/40]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
PT05.04.2013
Former [2013/37]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
NL05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
RO05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
Former [2013/35]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
Former [2013/34]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
ES16.03.2013
IS05.04.2013
Former [2013/33]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
ES16.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
ES16.03.2013
Former [2013/26]FI05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
ES16.03.2013
Former [2013/23]FI05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
LV05.12.2012
PL05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
ES16.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI05.12.2012
LT05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
ES16.03.2013
Former [2013/21]LT05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
Former [2013/20]LT05.12.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2007125276  (WELLSTREAM INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 13 * * claim 1 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US3651525  (RUTTEN HENDRIKUS S, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 11 - line 61 * * figures 6-8 *;
 [A]US4065822  (WILBOURN JAMES P) [A] 1-15 * figures 2,3 *