Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2419589

EP2419589 - HINGE OF A ROOF WINDOW PIVOT SASH AND A UNIT FOR FASTENING THE HINGE TO THE FRAME, IN PARTICULAR OF A ROOF WINDOW SASH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.12.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fakro PP Spolka Z O.O.
Ul. Wegierska 144a
33-300 Nowy Sacz / PL
[2012/08]
Inventor(s)01 / FLOREK, Ryszard
Losie 11
PL-33-356 Labowa / PL
 [2012/08]
Representative(s)Lukaszyk, Szymon , et al
Kancelaria Patentowa Lukaszyk
ul. Glowackiego 8
40-062 Katowice / PL
[2014/13]
Former [2012/08]Lukaszyk, Szymon , et al
Kancelaria Patentowa Lukaszyk ul. Glowackiego 8/6
40-062 Katowice / PL
Application number, filing date09788420.910.07.2009
WO2009PL50013
Priority number, datePL2008038564811.07.2008         Original published format: PL 38564808
[2012/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010005331
Date:14.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2419589
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010
[2012/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2419589
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:E05D5/04, E05D7/082
[2012/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
TitleGerman:SCHARNIER FÜR EINEN DACHFENSTERSCHWINGFLÜGEL UND EINHEIT ZUR BEFESTIGUNG DES SCHARNIERS AM RAHMEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE DACHFENSTERZARGE[2012/08]
English:HINGE OF A ROOF WINDOW PIVOT SASH AND A UNIT FOR FASTENING THE HINGE TO THE FRAME, IN PARTICULAR OF A ROOF WINDOW SASH[2012/08]
French:CHARNIERE D'UN CHASSIS A PIVOT DE LUCARNE ET UNITE POUR FIXER LA CHARNIERE AU CADRE, EN PARTICULIER D'UN CHASSIS DE LUCARNE[2012/08]
Entry into regional phase11.02.2011National basic fee paid 
11.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2011Examination requested  [2012/08]
15.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2014Fee for grant paid
02.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.07.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.2014  10.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
VKR-Holding A/S
Breeltevej 18
2970 Horsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
AWA Denmark A/S, et al
Strandgade 56
1401 Copenhagen K / DK
 [N/P]
Former [2016/02]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2014  10.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
VKR-Holding A/S
Breeltevej 18
DK-2970 Horsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
Awapatent A/S, et al
Rigensgade 11
1316 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2015/05]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2014   
VKR-Holding A/S
Breeltevej 18
DK-2970 Horsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
Carlsson, Eva, et al
Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11
1316 Copenhagen K / DK
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
17.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition07.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0348/17
20.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
17.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.07.2009
AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
MK26.03.2014
MT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
SM26.03.2014
TR26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IE10.07.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU10.07.2009
AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
MT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
SM26.03.2014
TR26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IE10.07.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/32]HU10.07.2009
AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
MT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
SM26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IE10.07.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/28]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
MT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
SM26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IE10.07.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/22]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
SM26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IE10.07.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/21]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IE10.07.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/37]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IE10.07.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/36]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/18]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/13]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
LU10.07.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
Former [2014/47]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
NO26.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
NO26.06.2014
Former [2014/41]FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
NO26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
NO26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.03.2014
NO26.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]NL1002198C  (HOUTINDUSTRIE NORHTGO B V [NL]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [X]FR2738867  (ALCAN FRANCE [FR]) [X] 11-13 * page 9, lines 24-32; figure 9 *;
 [A]WO2008013464  (FAKRO PP SPOLKA ZOO [PL], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *
by applicantNL1002198C