Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2340062

EP2340062 - Reduced pressure wound closure systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/27]REDUCED-PRESSURE, WOUND-CLOSURE AND TREATMENT SYSTEMS AND METHODS
[2012/37]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2017/02]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
12930 IH-10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US
Former [2017/01]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Former [2011/27]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
Legal Department - Intellectual Property P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HEATON, Keith, Patrick
73 Penn Hill Avenue
Poole Dorset BH14 9LY / GB
02 / HARDMAN, Ian, James
74 Victoria Avenue
Bournemouth Dorset BH9 2RP / GB
03 / COWARD, Christopher, Guy
11 Norden Drive
Northmoor Park
Wareham Dorset BH20 4SF / GB
04 / HALL, Colin, John
33 Oakdale Road
Poole Dorset BH15 3LD / GB
 [2011/45]
Former [2011/27]01 / HEATON, Keith, Patrick
3 Clifton Road Penn Hill
Poole BH14 1TY / GB
02 / HARDMAN, Ian, James
74 Victoria Avenue
Bournemouth Dorset BH9 2RP / GB
03 / COWARD, Christopher, Guy
11 Norden Drive Northmoor Park
Wareham Dorset BH20 4SF / GB
04 / HALL, Colin, John
33 Oakdale Road
Poole Dorset BH15 3LD / GB
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/42]Cordina, Kevin John , et al
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Former [2012/13]Ashton, Timothy , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2011/27]Ashton, Timothy
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date09789695.515.05.2009
[2011/27]
WO2009US44264
Priority number, dateUS20080109390P29.10.2008         Original published format: US 109390 P
US20080109448P29.10.2008         Original published format: US 109448 P
US20080109410P29.10.2008         Original published format: US 109410 P
US20080109486P29.10.2008         Original published format: US 109486 P
[2011/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010051071
Date:06.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2340062
Date:06.07.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010
[2011/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2340062
Date:26.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00
[2011/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/27]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Systeme zum Verschluss von Wunden durch verringerten Druck[2013/04]
English:Reduced pressure wound closure systems[2012/37]
French:Systèmes de fermeture de plaie à pression réduite[2012/37]
Former [2011/27]SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN MIT VERRINGERTEM DRUCK ZUM VERSCHLUSS VON TIEFLIEGENDEN GEWEBEN
Former [2011/27]REDUCED-PRESSURE, WOUND-CLOSURE AND TREATMENT SYSTEMS AND METHODS
Former [2011/27]FERMETURE DE PLAIE À PRESSION RÉDUITE ET SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT
Entry into regional phase11.03.2011National basic fee paid 
11.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/27]
19.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2013Fee for grant paid
29.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13166492.2  / EP2623137
EP19177120.3
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  27.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Smith and Nephew, Inc.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited, et al
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
 [2017/14]
Former [2014/17]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014   
Smith and Nephew, Inc.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
Opponent's representative
Uno, Jennifer Elizabeth Hayes, et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York, YO1 8NQ / GB
04.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
09.05.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1592/16
19.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
05.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1592/16
08.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.05.2009
AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
MK26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
TR26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
IE15.05.2014
LU15.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU15.05.2009
AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
TR26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
IE15.05.2014
LU15.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/32]HU15.05.2009
AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
IE15.05.2014
LU15.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/16]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
IE15.05.2014
LU15.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/21]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
IE15.05.2014
LU15.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/09]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
LU15.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
LU15.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/04]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
LU15.05.2014
Former [2014/24]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/18]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/14]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY24.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/12]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY24.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY24.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY24.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/08]BE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT26.06.2013
NO26.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2007041642  (KCI LICENSING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0088]; figures 9-13c *;
 [A]WO0185248  (KCI LICENSING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * page 7, line 17 - page 10, line 26; figure - *;
 [A]US2006079852  (BUBB STEPHEN K [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract *;
 [A]US2005085795  (LOCKWOOD JEFFREY S [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-5 *