Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2323819

EP2323819 - RAZOR BLADES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.09.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2016Change - applicantpublished on 14.12.2016  [2016/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2016/50]
Former [2012/23]For all designated states
The Gillette Company
One Gillette Park- 3E
Boston, MA 02127 / US
Former [2011/21]For all designated states
The Gillette Company
World Shaving Headquarters IP/Legal Department - 3E One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CLAUS, Oliver, H.
9 Brown Drive
Walpole MA 02081 / US
02 / DEPUYDT, Joseph, Allan
129 Maple Street
Scituate MA 02066 / US
03 / HAHN, Steve, S.
7 Trinity Court
Wellesley Hills MA 02481 / US
04 / JU, Yongqing
63 Blacksmith Drive
Medfield MA 02052 / US
05 / MADEIRA, John
5 Amanda Road
Assonet MA 02702 / US
06 / MARCHEV, Krassimir, Grigorov
9 Patricia Road
Sudbury MA 01776 / US
07 / SKROBIS, Kenneth, James
1 Carbone Circle
Maynard MA 01754 / US
08 / SONNENBERG, Neville
101 Hanson Road
Newton MA 02459 / US
09 / WHITE, Charles, Samuel
27 Chatham Way
Lynnfield MA 01940 / US
 [2011/21]
Representative(s)Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/40]Pierce, Christopher James , et al
Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower 31st Floor Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
Former [2011/24]Chandrani, Vandita , et al
Procter & Gamble Patent Department Technical Centres Limited Rusham Park Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Former [2011/21]Pierce, Christopher James , et al
Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower 31st Floor Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date09790146.608.07.2009
[2011/21]
WO2009US49906
Priority number, dateUS2008017405816.07.2008         Original published format: US 174058
[2011/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010008980
Date:21.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2323819
Date:25.05.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010
[2011/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2323819
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/56, B26B21/60
[2011/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/21]
TitleGerman:RASIERKLINGEN[2011/21]
English:RAZOR BLADES[2011/21]
French:LAMES DE RASOIR[2011/21]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2010National basic fee paid 
20.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/21]
26.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2012Fee for grant paid
13.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.07.2013  18.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
1350 Timberlake Manor Parkway
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/39]
Opponent(s)01  12.07.2013  18.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
1350 Timberlake Manor Parkway
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
Opponent's representative
Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2013/34]
Opponent(s)01  12.07.2013  18.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Eveready Battery Company, Inc.
533 Maryville University Drive
St Louis, Missouri 63141 / US
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
30.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition11.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0266/16
12.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
02.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0266/16
12.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.07.2009
AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
MK24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
SM24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE08.07.2013
LU08.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
MK24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
SM24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE08.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2015/24]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
SM24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE08.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/36]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE08.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/33]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE08.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/14]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/21]SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
Former [2013/20]NO24.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]WO03006218  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 9; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB1465697  (WILKINSON SWORD LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 19-27 * * page 2, line 1; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP1287953  (KAI R&D CENTER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0015] - [0019]; figure 1c *;
 [A]WO02100610  (DIAMANX PRODUCTS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *