Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2430637

EP2430637 - ECR PARTICLE BEAM SOURCE APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.07.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
04.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alpha Source, Inc.
8581 Santa Monica Blvd. No. 471
Los Angeles CA 90069 / US
[2016/11]
Former [2012/12]For all designated states
Alpha Source LLC
2625 Townsgate Road Suite 330
West Lake Village, CA 91361 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROSENTHAL, Glenn, B.
3451 Military Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90034 / US
 [2012/12]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/11]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2012/12]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Ipulse
126-130-Regent Street
London W1B 5SE / GB
Application number, filing date09790533.516.07.2009
WO2009US50839
Priority number, dateUS20090178857P15.05.2009         Original published format: US 178857 P
[2012/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010132068
Date:18.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2430637
Date:21.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010
[2012/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:G21G4/08, H01J27/18, H01J37/08, H05H1/18
[2012/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/12]
TitleGerman:ECR-PARTIKELSTRAHLQUELLENVORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2012/12]
English:ECR PARTICLE BEAM SOURCE APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND METHOD[2012/12]
French:APPAREIL, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SOURCE DE FAISCEAUX DE PARTICULES ECR[2012/12]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2011National basic fee paid 
13.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/12]
12.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
02.05.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination15.07.2014Appeal received No.  T2037/14
12.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
19.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.07.2013Request for further processing filed
10.07.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.07.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201305   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US5506475  (ALTON GERALD D [US]) [X] 1-5,12,13,18,40-42,49-53,60,61,66,88,89 * column 2, lines 9-29; figures 1,5-12 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 24 * * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 34 * * column 9, line 1 - line 22 * * column 10, line 33 - line 38 *;
 [X]WO02063637  (SCHWERIONENFORSCH GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,49-51,53-55 * page 14, line 1 - page 19, line 10; figures 1,2; table 3 *;
 [XY]JP2003257329  (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO) [X] 1,6,46-49,54,94-96 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0042] * [Y] 10,11,58,59;
 [A]US4857809  (TORII YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 7-9,55-57 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 48; figures 1,2,7 *
 [XY]  - M. SCLAPP, R.C. PARDO, R.C. VONDRASEK ET AL., "A new 14 GHz electron-cyclotron-resonance ion source for the heavy ion accelerator facility ATLAS", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, (1998), vol. 69, no. 2, pages 631 - 633, XP002552914 [X] 1-5,48-53,96 * abstract * [Y] 10,11,58,59

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1148725
by applicantUS5506475