Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2344096

EP2344096 - VARYING MATERIAL PROPERTIES OF A SINGLE FLUIDIC LINE IN OPHTHALMOLOGY TUBING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2011/31]
Former [2011/29]For all designated states
Alcon, Inc.
Bösch 69
6331 Hünenberg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / PETERSON, Robert, Harry
26 Aloysia
Rancho Santa Margarita CA 92688 / US
 [2011/29]
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2011/29]Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date09791487.313.08.2009
[2011/29]
WO2009US53708
Priority number, dateUS2008020428404.09.2008         Original published format: US 204284
[2011/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010027619
Date:11.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2344096
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010
[2011/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2344096
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/007, A61M39/00
[2011/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/29]
TitleGerman:VARIIERUNG VON MATERIALEIGENSCHAFTEN EINER EINZELNEN FLUIDIKLEITUNG IN OPHTHALMOLOGISCHEN SCHLÄUCHEN[2011/29]
English:VARYING MATERIAL PROPERTIES OF A SINGLE FLUIDIC LINE IN OPHTHALMOLOGY TUBING[2011/29]
French:PROPRIÉTÉS VARIABLES DE MATÉRIAU D UNE LIGNE FLUIDIQUE UNIQUE DANS UNE TUBULURE D'OPHTALMOLOGIE[2011/29]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2011National basic fee paid 
22.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/29]
15.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2012Fee for grant paid
02.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.08.2013  19.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Geuder AG
Hertzstrasse 4
69126 Heidelberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann
PartG mbB
Schneidmühlstrasse 21
69115 Heidelberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/38]
Opponent(s)01  07.08.2013   
Geuder AG
Hertzstrasse 4
69126 Heidelberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Ullrich & Naumann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schneidmühlstrasse 21
69115 Heidelberg / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
26.09.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.02.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.03.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition10.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1149/16
02.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
13.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.08.2009
AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IS14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
MK14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
SM14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE13.08.2013
LU13.08.2013
[2016/32]
Former [2015/34]HU13.08.2009
AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
MK14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
SM14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE13.08.2013
LU13.08.2013
Former [2015/32]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
MK14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
SM14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE13.08.2013
Former [2015/24]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
SM14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE13.08.2013
Former [2014/33]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE13.08.2013
Former [2014/20]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/52]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/37]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/28]BE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/27]BE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
Former [2013/26]FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
Former [2013/24]FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
Former [2013/20]LT14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006135974  (PERKINS JAMES T [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0174427  (UNIV DUKE [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1917987  (ALCON INC [CH]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *