Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2344148 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2344148



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2111
11.04.2024 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.04.2024 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
22.03.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.03.2024 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
22.03.2024 French translation of claims Opposition 1
22.03.2024 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
22.03.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.03.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.02.2024 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
08.02.2024 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
08.02.2024 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
05.02.2024 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
05.02.2024 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
02.02.2024 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
03.11.2023 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.11.2023 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 33
03.11.2023 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
03.11.2023 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.11.2023 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.11.2023 Means of redress Opposition 2
03.11.2023 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 48
03.11.2023 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 48
17.05.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.05.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.05.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
17.05.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
28.04.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.04.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.04.2023 Amended description with annotations Opposition 1
21.04.2023 Description Opposition 1
21.04.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.04.2023 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2022 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
23.12.2022 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
23.12.2022 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
23.12.2022 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
23.12.2022 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
09.09.2022 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2022 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2022 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
24.08.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.08.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.08.2022 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
04.08.2022 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.08.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.08.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.08.2022 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2022 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2022 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2022 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.02.2022 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
01.02.2022 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
01.02.2022 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2022 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2022 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 12
01.02.2022 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 12
01.11.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.11.2021 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
01.11.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.09.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 28
28.09.2021 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 25
28.09.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
28.09.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
15.07.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.07.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.07.2021 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
23.06.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.06.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.06.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.06.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 2
21.06.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 2
21.06.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 2
21.06.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 Appeal 2
21.06.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 Appeal 2
21.06.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 14 Appeal 2
21.06.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 15 Appeal 2
21.06.2021 Claims Appeal 1
21.06.2021 Claims Appeal 1
21.06.2021 Claims Appeal 1
21.06.2021 Claims Appeal 1
21.06.2021 Claims Appeal 1
21.06.2021 Claims Appeal 1
21.06.2021 Claims Appeal 1
21.06.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.06.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.06.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.06.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.03.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.03.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.03.2021 F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO Appeal 9
03.03.2021 F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO Appeal 9
01.03.2021 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.01.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.01.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.01.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.01.2021 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
13.01.2021 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
13.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.01.2021 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
12.01.2021 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
11.01.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2021 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
06.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.01.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.12.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.12.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.12.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.12.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
03.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.08.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.07.2020 Communication about missing proof of delivery Appeal 1
20.07.2020 General enquiry Appeal 1
28.05.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.05.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.05.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.05.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.05.2020 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
18.05.2020 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.05.2020 Consolidated list of documents cited in appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.05.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
31.07.2019 Refund of fees Appeal 1
22.07.2019 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 2
13.06.2019 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 4
12.06.2019 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 4
11.06.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
07.06.2019 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 54
31.05.2019 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 33
14.01.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.09.2018 Citation in appeal procedure - 001 Appeal 8
28.09.2018 Citation in appeal procedure - 002 Appeal 3
28.09.2018 Citation in appeal procedure - 003 Appeal 7
28.09.2018 Citation in appeal procedure - 004 Appeal 5
28.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.09.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
28.05.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 14 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 15 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 16 Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Claims Appeal 1
18.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 3
18.05.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
18.05.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
13.04.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.04.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.03.2018 Processing of an appeal Opposition 2
16.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
16.03.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.01.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.01.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
08.01.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
08.01.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
08.01.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.01.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.01.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
07.12.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.12.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 19
27.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.11.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.11.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.11.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.11.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.11.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 2
27.11.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 2
27.11.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 2
27.11.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 Opposition 2
27.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
27.11.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
12.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 33
11.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 30
11.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
06.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.10.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 27
06.10.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
05.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.10.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.04.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
06.04.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.04.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.01.2017 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
17.01.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 33
06.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.01.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.01.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.01.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.01.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.01.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.01.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 2
06.01.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 2
06.01.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 2
06.01.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 2
06.01.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 2
06.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.01.2017 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
05.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.01.2017 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.07.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 5
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 25
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 12
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 11
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 9
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 7
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 12
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 10
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 16
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 5
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 3
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 176
21.07.2016 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 182
21.07.2016 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
21.07.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
21.07.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 37
21.10.2015 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
24.09.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.09.2015 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 2
27.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.08.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.08.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
27.08.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 64
17.07.2015 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 64
01.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.07.2015 Description Search / examination 8
01.07.2015 Drawings Search / examination 1
01.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.07.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.06.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
04.05.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Description Search / examination 4
04.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.10.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
08.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
08.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.08.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.06.2014 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.02.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.02.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
18.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.10.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
30.09.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
23.09.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 38
04.09.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 38
31.07.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.07.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.07.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.06.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
14.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.04.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
14.04.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.04.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
07.04.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 16
28.01.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.09.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 9
23.09.2010 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
27.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 4
27.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
27.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 10
16.04.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 92
25.03.2010 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 67
28.09.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.09.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 4
28.09.2009 Description International Searching Authority 61
28.09.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 1