Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2310808

EP2310808 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF COORDINATION OF MEASUREMENT SUBSYSTEMS OF A FLOW METER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
21.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daniel Measurement and Control, Inc.
11100 Brittmoore Park Drive
Houston, Texas 77041 / US
[2013/22]
Former [2011/16]For all designated states
Daniel Measurement and Control, Inc.
11100 Brittmore Park Drive
Houston, Texas 77041 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GROESCHEL, Keith, V.
5126 Hillingworth Ct.
Houston TX 77084 / US
02 / STRAUB, Henry, C., Jr.
4119 Rocky Bend Drive
Sugar Land TX 77479 / US
 [2011/16]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/40]Roberts, Peter David , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester, M1 4HD / GB
Former [2011/38]Holmes, Matthew Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester, M1 4HD / GB
Former [2011/16]Holmes, Matthew Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date09794875.609.06.2009
[2011/16]
WO2009US46711
Priority number, dateUS2008016967809.07.2008         Original published format: US 169678
[2011/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010005667
Date:14.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2310808
Date:20.04.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010
[2011/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2310808
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.03.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01F1/66, G01F1/60
[2011/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR KOORDINATION VON MESSSUBSYSTEMEN EINER FLUSSMESSERS[2011/16]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM OF COORDINATION OF MEASUREMENT SUBSYSTEMS OF A FLOW METER[2011/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COORDINATION DE SOUS-SYSTÈMES DE MESURE D UN DÉBITMÈTRE[2011/16]
Entry into regional phase19.10.2010National basic fee paid 
19.10.2010Search fee paid 
19.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/16]
15.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2013Fee for grant paid
08.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.07.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.01.2014   
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
Opponent's representative
Ludewigt, Christoph
Sick AG
Intellectual Property
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 [2014/10]
04.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
29.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.05.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition08.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1625/16
11.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MK29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
LU09.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MK29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2015/30]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2015/13]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
IT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
ES09.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
PT30.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[I]US3940985  (WYLER JOHN S) [I] 1-10 * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US7152490  (FREUND JR WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JPS5539035  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH08304435  (KAIJO KK);
 [A]JPS59104026U  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.);
 [A]US6435037  (DOTEN GREGORY P [US])
by applicantUS3940985