EP2384373 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING WELDABLE HIGH-STRENGTH ALUMINUM ALLOYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/45] | WELDABLE HIGH-STRENGTH ALUMINUM ALLOYS | ||
[2014/24] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANKARAN, Kirshnan K. 12881 Glenbernie Lane St. Louis Missouri 63146 / US | 02 /
SLATTERY, Kevin T. 41 Meadow Spring Drive St. Charles Missouri 63303 / US | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2011/45] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09796270.8 | 23.12.2009 | WO2009US69441 | Priority number, date | US20090349668 | 07.01.2009 Original published format: US 349668 | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010080661 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2384373 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2384373 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/06 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
C22C21/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12764 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON GESCHWEISSTEN TEILEN AUS HOCHFESTEN ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGEN | [2014/44] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING WELDABLE HIGH-STRENGTH ALUMINUM ALLOYS | [2014/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE PIÈCES D'ALUMINIUM SOUDÉES À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/45] | SCHWEISSBARE HOCHFESTE ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGEN | ||
Former [2011/45] | WELDABLE HIGH-STRENGTH ALUMINUM ALLOYS | ||
Former [2011/45] | ALLIAGES D'ALUMINIUM SOUDABLES À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 22.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.2015
03.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE Aleris Rolled Products Germany GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 10 56070 Koblenz / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | 02
29.07.2015
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE Opponent's representative LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.2015
03.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE Aleris Rolled Products Germany GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 10 56070 Koblenz / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | ||
02
29.07.2015
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE Opponent's representative LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.2015
03.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE Aleris Rolled Products Germany GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 10 56070 Koblenz / DE Opponent's representative Bauer, Clemens Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
02
29.07.2015
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE Opponent's representative Kopf Westenberger Wachenhausen Patentanwälte PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.2015
Aleris Rolled Products Germany GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 10 56070 Koblenz / DE Opponent's representative Bauer, Clemens Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
02
29.07.2015
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE Opponent's representative Boos, Melanie Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 07.09.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.01.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.04.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/21] | Appeal following opposition | 11.04.2018 | Appeal received No. T0964/18 | 12.06.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.04.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2009 | AT | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | HR | 29.10.2014 | IT | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | MK | 29.10.2014 | MT | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | SM | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | IE | 23.12.2014 | LU | 23.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | NO | 29.01.2015 | GR | 30.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | PT | 02.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1217085 (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-20* table 1 *; | [X]RU2184165 (GP VSEROSSIJSKIJ NAUCHN, et al) [X] 1-20 * table 1 *; | [X]RU2237097 (AVIATION MATERIALS RES INST) [X] 1-20 * table 1 *; | [X]WO2007020041 (CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPROD GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 6, line 36; tables 1-1 * | Examination | WO2007092294 |