Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2379648

EP2379648 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING AQUEOUS SUSPENSIONS OF MINERAL MATERIALS OR DRIED MINERAL MATERIALS, THE OBTAINED PRODUCTS, AS WELL AS USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HR, HU
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Omya International AG
Baslerstrasse 42
4665 Oftringen / CH
[2013/52]
Former [2011/43]For all designated states
Omya Development AG
Baslerstrasse 42
4665 Oftringen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / GANE, Patrick A.C.
Studenweg 8
CH-4852 Rothrist / CH
02 / BURI, Matthias
Mätteliweg 20
CH-4852 Rothrist / CH
03 / KARTH, Beat
Haselweg 16
3363 Oberoenz / CH
04 / RENTSCH, Samuel
Höheweg 1
CH-4663 Aarburg / CH
 [2018/33]
Former [2011/43]01 / GANE, Patrick A.C.
Studenweg 8
CH-4852 Rothrist / CH
02 / BURI, Matthias
Mätteliweg 20
CH-4852 Rothrist / CH
03 / KARTH, Beat
Erlenweg 16
CH-3363 Oberoenz / CH
04 / RENTSCH, Samuel
Höheweg 1
CH-4663 Aarburg / CH
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/26]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2011/43]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date09796366.416.12.2009
WO2009EP67310
Priority number, dateEP2008017246519.12.2008         Original published format: EP 08172465
US20090249771P08.10.2009         Original published format: US 249771 P
[2011/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010070002
Date:24.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2379648
Date:26.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010
[2011/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2379648
Date:26.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:C09C1/02, C09C3/04, D21H17/00, C09C1/04, D21H17/69, // D21H19/42
[2016/49]
Former International [2011/43]C09C1/02, C09C3/04, D21H17/00, C09C1/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG WÄSSRIGER SUSPENSIONEN VON GEGEBENENFALLS GETROCKNETEN MINERALSTOFFEN, DIE ERHALTENEN PRODUKTE SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG[2011/45]
English:PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING AQUEOUS SUSPENSIONS OF MINERAL MATERIALS OR DRIED MINERAL MATERIALS, THE OBTAINED PRODUCTS, AS WELL AS USES THEREOF[2011/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE SUSPENSIONS AQUEUSES DE MATIÈRES MINÉRALES OU DE MATIÈRES MINÉRALES SÉCHÉES, PRODUITS AINSI OBTENUS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2011/43]
Former [2011/43]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG W?SSRIGER SUSPENSIONEN VON GEGEBENENFALLS GETROCKNETEN MINERALSTOFFEN, DIE ERHALTENEN PRODUKTE SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG
Entry into regional phase12.07.2011National basic fee paid 
12.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/43]
28.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2013Fee for grant paid
13.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.06.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014   
Schaefer Kalk GmbH & Co. KG
Louise-Seher-Strasse 6
65582 Diez / DE
Opponent's representative
Mai Dörr Besier European Patent Attorneys
European Trademark Attorneys
Patentanwälte
Kreuzberger Ring 64
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/17]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014   
Schaefer Kalk GmbH & Co. KG
Louise-Seher-Strasse 6
D-65582 Diez / DE
Opponent's representative
Mai, Dörr, Besier
Patentanwälte
Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer
Kreuzberger Ring 64
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
08.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.11.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.03.2016
23.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
26.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
24.08.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.11.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition26.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0260/17
27.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0260/17
21.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
16.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201103   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2012
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
MK26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SM26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
HR16.12.2018
HU17.12.2018
[2019/50]
Former [2015/41]CY26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
MK26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SM26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
Former [2015/32]CY26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
MK26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SM26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
Former [2015/24]CY26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SM26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
Former [2015/21]CY26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
Former [2014/48]CY26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
Former [2014/38]CY26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
LU16.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
Former [2014/11]EE26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
CY24.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
Former [2014/10]EE26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
CY24.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
Former [2014/02]LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/50]LT26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT26.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[XAI]EP0542644  (COATEX SA [FR]) [X] 1-8,15-16,20,23-36,38-40,43-45,48-50 * page 1, lines 1-20 * * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 50; examples 1,4; table 4 * [A] 37,41-42,46-47 [I] 9-14,17-19,21-22;
 [XAI]FR2903618  (COATEX SAS [FR]) [X] 1-8,15-16,20,23-40,43-45,48-50 * page 1, lines 5-27 * * page 7, line 27 - page 12, line 28 * * page 13, line 5 - page 15, line 20 * * page 17, line 30 - page 18, column 5; tables 1,2 * [A] 41-42,46-47 [I] 9-14,17-19,21-22;
 [XAI]US5181662  (BOUSQUET HUBERT [FR], et al) [X] 1-8,15-16,20,23-40,43-45,48-50 * column 4, line 31 - column 6, line 7; examples 1,2; claims 1-20; table 1 * [A] 41-42,46-47 [I] 9-14,17-19,21-22;
 [X]EP0412027  (COATEX SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,23-31,33,35-36,43-45,48 * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 35; examples 1,5; table 5 *;
 [A]US6767973  (SUAU JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1-50 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 36; examples 1,6; table 5 *
by applicantWO0249766
 EP0850685
 WO2008010055
 WO2007072168
 US3006779