Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2374061

EP2374061 - MULTI-THREADED SUBGRAPH EXECUTION CONTROL IN A GRAPHICAL MODELING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.01.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The MathWorks, Inc.
3 Apple Hill Drive
Natick, MA 01760 / US
[2016/11]
Former [2011/41]For all designated states
The Mathworks, Inc.
3 Apple Hill Drive
Natick, MA 01760 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CIOLFI, John, Edward
32 Pickerel Road
Wellesley MA 02482 / US
02 / MANI, Ramamurthy
21 Sylvan Way
Wayland MA 01778 / US
03 / ZHANG, Qu
7 Francine Drive
Holliston MA 01746 / US
 [2011/41]
Representative(s)Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/41]Tomlinson, Edward James
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date09797230.110.12.2009
WO2009US67549
Priority number, dateUS2009063450009.12.2009         Original published format: US 634500
US20080121747P11.12.2008         Original published format: US 121747 P
[2011/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010068790
Date:17.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2374061
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010
[2011/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F9/46
[2011/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleGerman:MEHRFACH-THREAD-SUBGRAPH-AUSFÜHRUNGSSTEUERUNG IN EINER UMGEBUNG DER GRAFISCHEN MODELLIERUNG[2011/41]
English:MULTI-THREADED SUBGRAPH EXECUTION CONTROL IN A GRAPHICAL MODELING ENVIRONMENT[2011/41]
French:COMMANDE D'EXÉCUTION DE SOUS-GRAPHE MULTIFILS DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE MODÉLISATION GRAPHIQUE[2011/41]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2011National basic fee paid 
07.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/41]
10.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2015
16.06.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination06.08.2015Appeal received No.  T2204/15
03.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[I]US2008222620  (LITTLE JOHN N [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056] * * figure 7 *;
 [A]US2003016206  (TAITEL HOWARD [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] *;
 [A]  - LAVAGNO L ET AL, "A Simulink(c)-based approach to system level design and architecture selection", EUROMICRO CONFERENCE, 2000. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 26TH SEPTEMBER 5-7, 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/EURMIC.2000.874618, (20000905), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7695-0780-4, pages 76 - 83, XP010514765 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 78, column l, line 9 - line 23 * * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EURMIC.2000.874618