Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2399281

EP2399281 - PROCESS FOR ELECTRODEPOSITION OF COPPER CHIP TO CHIP, CHIP TO WAFER AND WAFER TO WAFER INTERCONNECTS IN THROUGH-SILICON VIAS (TSV) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstraße 20
10553 Berlin / DE
[2016/16]
Former [2012/21]For all designated states
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstrasse 20
10553 Berlin / DE
Former [2011/52]For all designated states
ATOTECH Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstrasse 20
10553 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PREISSER, Robert, F.
54 Obere Strasse
721 19 Ammerbuch / DE
 [2011/52]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2011/52]Wonnemann, Jörg
Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Markenabteilung Erasmussstraße 20
10553 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date09799392.716.12.2009
[2016/16]
WO2009IB07793
Priority number, dateUS2009037211317.02.2009         Original published format: US 372113
[2011/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010094998
Date:26.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2399281
Date:28.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010
[2011/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2399281
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/288, H01L21/768, C25D3/38, C25D5/02, C25D5/18, C25D7/12, C25D21/16
[2016/01]
Former International [2011/52]H01L21/288, H01L21/768, C25D3/38, C25D5/18, C25D7/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/52]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROLYTISCHEN ABSCHEIDUNG VON KUPFER IN CHIP-ZU-CHIP, CHIP-ZU-WAFER UND WAFER-ZU-WAFER DURCHKONTAKTIERUNGEN DURCH SILIZIUM[2016/01]
English:PROCESS FOR ELECTRODEPOSITION OF COPPER CHIP TO CHIP, CHIP TO WAFER AND WAFER TO WAFER INTERCONNECTS IN THROUGH-SILICON VIAS (TSV)[2011/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLECTRODÉPOSITION D'INTERCONNEXIONS DE CUIVRE PUCE À PUCE, PUCE À TRANCHE ET TRANCHE À TRANCHE DANS DES TROUS D'INTERCONNEXIONS À TRAVERS LE SILICIUM (TSV)[2011/52]
Former [2011/52]VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROABSCHEIDUNG VON KUPFER CHIP ZU CHIP, CHIP ZU WAFER UND WAFER ZU WAFER IN TSVS (THROUGH-SILICON-VIAS)
Entry into regional phase19.09.2011National basic fee paid 
19.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/52]
16.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.02.2016Fee for grant paid
29.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2015
Opposition(s)23.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.12.2009
AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
CY20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IS20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MK20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
TR20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
GB16.12.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
MT16.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/43]
Former [2018/38]HU16.12.2009
AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
CY20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IS20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MK20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
TR20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
GB16.12.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU16.12.2009
AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CY20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IS20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MK20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
TR20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
GB16.12.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/29]HU16.12.2009
AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CY20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MK20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
TR20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
GB16.12.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/28]HU16.12.2009
AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CY20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MK20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
GB16.12.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/51]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
GB16.12.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
IE16.12.2016
LU16.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/47]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2006216921  (KATO OSAMU [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6793795  (MEYER HEINRICH [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE4344387  (ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE19545231  (ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2009018581  (ENTHONE [US]; RICHARDSON THOMAS B [US]; ZHANG YUN [US]; WANG CHEN [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [A]  - JEN TSUNG LUO ET AL, "The effect of pulse-reverse plating time on blind micro via filling", IMPACT 2008. 3RD INTERNATIONAL MICROSYSTEMS, PACKAGING, ASSEMBLY & CIRCUITS TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (2008), doi:10.1109/IMPACT.2008.4783895, ISBN 978-1-4244-3622-4, pages 395 - 398, XP002582020 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMPACT.2008.4783895