Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2374098

EP2374098 - ELECTRONIC TRANSACTION FRAUD PREVENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.08.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Moqom Limited
85 Gleann Na Ri Druid Valley Cherrywood Loughlinstown
Co. Dublin / IE
[2011/41]
Inventor(s)01 / COLIN, Larkin
Apartment 61 The Oaks
Rockfield
Dundrum
Dublin 14 / IE
 [2011/41]
Representative(s)Robinson, David Edward Ashdown , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Purdylucey Intellectual Property
6-7 Harcourt Terrace
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2011/41]Lucey, Michael
PURDYLUCEY Intellectual Property Suite 138-139 The Chapel Building Mary's Abbey
Dublin 7 / IE
Application number, filing date09799425.510.12.2009
WO2009IE00088
Priority number, dateIE2008000097710.12.2008         Original published format: IE 20080977
[2011/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010067342
Date:17.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2374098
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010
[2011/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/00
[2011/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleGerman:VERHINDERUNG VON BETRUG BEI ELEKTRONISCHEN TRANSAKTIONEN[2011/41]
English:ELECTRONIC TRANSACTION FRAUD PREVENTION[2011/41]
French:PRÉVENTION DE FRAUDE LORS D'UNE TRANSACTION ÉLECTRONIQUE[2011/41]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2011National basic fee paid 
07.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/41]
25.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
07.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
07.10.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination17.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0602/16
17.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.07.2014Request for further processing filed
30.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.08.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
22.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201204   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2013
31.12.201305   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[I]US2002133462  (SHTEYN YEVGENIY EUGENE [US]) [I] 1-42 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] *;
 [I]US6088683  (JALILI REZA [US]) [I] 1-42 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 15 * * figure 1 *;
 [I]EP1455317  (SHIU MING-CHING [TW]) [I] 1-42 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] * * figure 2 *