Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2422056

EP2422056 - METHOD AND PLANT FOR COMBINED SOLAR THERMAL ELECTRIC AND HEAT GENERATION AND REFRIGERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.04.2015  [2015/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pinter, Christian
Alois-Gossi-Gasse 11
7471 Rechnitz / AT
[2013/08]
Former [2012/09]For all designated states
Krotil, Richard
Dr. Sauerbruchweg 2
8430 Leibnitz / AT
For all designated states
Pinter, Christian
Alois-Gossi-Gasse 11
7471 Rechnitz / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Krotil Richard
Dr. Sauerbruchweg 2
8430 Leibnitz / AT
02 / Pinter Christian
Alois-Gossi-Gasse 11
7471 Rechnitz / AT
 [2013/08]
Former [2012/09]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Former [2013/08]Rafaseder, Wolfgang
Stock Rafaseder Gruszkiewicz
Rechtsanwälte
Schwindgasse 7/6
1040 Wien / AT
Former [2012/09](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date09799482.623.11.2009
WO2009AT00454
Priority number, dateAT2009000001005.01.2009         Original published format: AT 102009
[2012/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010075598
Date:08.07.2010
Language:DE
[2010/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2422056
Date:29.02.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010
[2012/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:F01K13/02, F01K25/06
[2012/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/09]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR GEKOPPELTEN SOLARTHERMISCHEN STROM-, WÄRME- UND KÄLTEERZEUGUNG[2012/09]
English:METHOD AND PLANT FOR COMBINED SOLAR THERMAL ELECTRIC AND HEAT GENERATION AND REFRIGERATION[2012/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION POUR LA TRIGÉNÉRATION HÉLIOTHERMIQUE DE COURANT, DE CHALEUR ET DE FROID[2012/09]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2011National basic fee paid 
28.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/09]
01.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/17]
01.08.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/17]
Appeal following examination06.08.2013Appeal received No.  J0020/13
04.10.2013Statement of grounds filed
15.12.2014Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2014/51]
19.02.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal withdrawn
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
28.12.2011Request for further processing filed
28.12.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.02.2012Decision despatched
28.12.2011Request for further processing filed
28.12.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.02.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
IE, FI, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
28.12.2011Request for further processing filed
28.12.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.02.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
28.12.2011Request for further processing filed
28.12.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.02.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201103   M06   Not yet paid
30.11.201406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]DE10162934  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * columns 5-6 *;
 [A]DE102006022792  (OSER ERWIN [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 4 *
by applicant   - P. NORES, "Thermische Kälteerzeugung mit Dampfstrahlkältemaschinen - Konzepte und Erfahrungen", KI LUFT- UND KäLTETECHNIK, (200611),