blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2422056 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2422056



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 203
18.01.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 1
18.01.2010 Description International Searching Authority 9
18.01.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 2
18.01.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
08.07.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 14
27.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
03.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
03.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
31.03.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
31.03.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
31.03.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.04.2011 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
03.05.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.05.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.07.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
28.10.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 4
28.12.2011 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 4
28.12.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
28.12.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
28.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
28.12.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.01.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
24.01.2012 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
01.02.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.02.2012 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
20.04.2012 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
01.08.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
08.08.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.08.2012 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 3
24.08.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
13.09.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.09.2012 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
20.09.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
21.11.2012 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
14.01.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.01.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
22.01.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.01.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.02.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 4
22.04.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 2
28.05.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 1
28.05.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 4
28.05.2013 Decision Search / examination 1
04.06.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.06.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
06.08.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
06.08.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
16.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
16.08.2013 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 3
20.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
09.09.2013 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Appeal 1
04.10.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
25.10.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.11.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.01.2014 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
27.05.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.12.2014 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 7
12.01.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.01.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
16.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.02.2015 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
24.02.2015 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
26.02.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
27.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.03.2015 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
10.03.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
13.03.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 2
18.03.2015 Refund of fees Appeal 1
24.03.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1