Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2422056 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2422056



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 203
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.03.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
18.03.2015 Refund of fees Appeal 1
13.03.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 2
10.03.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
06.03.2015 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
27.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.02.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
24.02.2015 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
19.02.2015 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
17.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.01.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
12.01.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.12.2014 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 7
27.05.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.01.2014 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
07.11.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.10.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.10.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
09.09.2013 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Appeal 1
20.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
16.08.2013 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 3
16.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
06.08.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
06.08.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
12.06.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
04.06.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.05.2013 Decision Search / examination 1
28.05.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 4
28.05.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 2
19.02.2013 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 4
22.01.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.01.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.01.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
14.01.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.11.2012 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
20.09.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.09.2012 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
13.09.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.08.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
24.08.2012 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 3
08.08.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.08.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
20.04.2012 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
15.02.2012 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
01.02.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.01.2012 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
04.01.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
28.12.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
28.12.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
28.12.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
28.12.2011 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 4
28.10.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 4
21.07.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
13.05.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.05.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
05.04.2011 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
31.03.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
31.03.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
31.03.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
03.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.02.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
27.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
08.07.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 14
18.01.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
18.01.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 2
18.01.2010 Description International Searching Authority 9
18.01.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 1