Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2422056


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.03.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
11.03.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
05.03.2015 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
25.02.2015 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2014 New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
15.01.2014 Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
15.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2013 Change: Appeal number
05.11.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
30.10.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
30.10.2013 Deletion: Appeal number
30.10.2013 New entry: Appeal number
28.10.2013 Deletion: Appeal number
28.09.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
16.08.2013 Change - representative published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
16.08.2013 Change - representative published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
12.08.2013 New entry: Appeal number
18.01.2013 Change - applicant published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
18.01.2013 Change - applicant published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
18.01.2013 Change - representative published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
18.01.2013 Change - inventor published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
31.07.2012 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
13.07.2012 Change - designated states published on  15.08.2012  [2012/33]
13.07.2012 Change - request for examination published on  15.08.2012  [2012/33]
29.06.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
27.06.2012 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
27.06.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
26.06.2012 Deletion: PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid
26.06.2012 New entry: PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid
26.06.2012 Deletion: Fee payment for request for further processing
26.06.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
08.06.2012 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
08.06.2012 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
08.06.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
09.03.2012 Change - extension states published on  11.04.2012  [2012/15]
27.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.2012 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
27.01.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.02.2012  [2012/09]
27.01.2012 Request for examination filed published on  29.02.2012  [2012/09]
17.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2012 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
17.01.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
30.12.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
21.10.2011 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
23.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
01.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
28.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
09.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
28.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication