blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2422056
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2422056Global Dossier 29.02.2012A2
Priority number Date
WO2009AT00454 23.11.2009
AT102009 05.01.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010075598Global Dossier 31.03.2011A3
WO2010075598 08.07.2010A2
Priority number Date
AT102009 05.01.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT507218B 15.03.2010B1
AT507218 15.03.2010A4
Priority number Date
AT102009 05.01.2009