Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2368198

EP2368198 - IDENTIFYING COMMENTS TO SHOW IN CONNECTION WITH A DOCUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2011/39]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway, Building 41
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CIERNIAK, Michal
1118 Stanley Way
Palo Alto California 94303 / US
 [2011/39]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/39]Betten & Resch
Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date09799816.517.12.2009
WO2009US68350
Priority number, dateUS2008033816618.12.2008         Original published format: US 338166
[2011/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010080454
Date:15.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2368198
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010
[2011/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2011/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleGerman:IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON IN VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM DOKUMENT ZU ZEIGENDEN KOMMENTAREN[2011/39]
English:IDENTIFYING COMMENTS TO SHOW IN CONNECTION WITH A DOCUMENT[2011/39]
French:IDENTIFICATION DE COMMENTAIRES POUR UNE REPRÉSENTATION EN LIAISON AVEC UN DOCUMENT[2011/39]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2011National basic fee paid 
22.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/39]
25.02.2013Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
15.03.2013Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
10.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
03.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
03.08.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination11.10.2017Appeal received No.  T0238/18
13.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6282548  (BURNER MICHAEL G [US] ET AL) [X] 23-30 * figure 10 * * column 15, line 50 - line 64 * * column 12, line 48 - column 13, line 20 * [I] 1-22;
 [I]US2007143694  (RAKOWSKI BRIAN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-30 * paragraphs [0040] - [0044]; figures 6,7A *;
 [A]  - HENZINGER M R, "Hyperlink analysis for the Web", IEEE INTERNET COMPUTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010101), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1089-7801, pages 45 - 50, XP009122911 [A] 1-30 * page 45, column r - page 46, column l *