Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2368199

EP2368199 - ASYNCHRONOUS DISTRIBUTED DE-DUPLICATION FOR REPLICATED CONTENT ADDRESSABLE STORAGE CLUSTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2011/39]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Building 41
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DATUASHVILI, Gia
10140 Orange Avenue
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / KESSELMAN, Alexander
718 Old San Francisco Road
Apartment 291
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
03 / DROBYCHEV, Alexandre
4250 Albany Drive
F-305
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
 [2018/44]
Former [2011/39]01 / DATUASHVILI, Gia
10140 Orange Avenue
Cupertino California 95014 / US
02 / KESSELMAN, Alexander
718 Old San Francisco Road
Apartment 291
Sunnyvale California 94086 / US
03 / DROBYCHEV, Alexandre
4250 Albany Drive
F-305
San Jose California 95129 / US
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[2018/44]
Former [2011/39]Betten & Resch
Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date09799831.422.12.2009
[2018/44]
WO2009US69234
Priority number, dateUS20080139857P22.12.2008         Original published format: US 139857 P
[2011/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010075407
Date:01.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2368199
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010
[2011/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2368199
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2011/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/44]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ASYNCHRONE VERTEILTE ENTDUPLIKATION FÜR REPLIZIERTE INHALTSADRESSIERBARE SPEICHERCLUSTER[2011/39]
English:ASYNCHRONOUS DISTRIBUTED DE-DUPLICATION FOR REPLICATED CONTENT ADDRESSABLE STORAGE CLUSTERS[2011/39]
French:DÉDUPLICATION RÉPARTIE ASYNCHRONE POUR DES GRAPPES DE MÉMOIRE ADRESSABLES À CONTENU RÉPLIQUÉ[2011/39]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2011National basic fee paid 
20.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/39]
18.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2018Fee for grant paid
18.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.07.2016
Opposition(s)01.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
LU22.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/40]AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
LU22.12.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/39]AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
LU22.12.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AT31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]US6438562  (GUPTA SHIVANI [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 5, lines 6-12 * * column 12, line 9 - column 14, line 29 *;
 [A]US2005193024  (BEYER KEVIN S [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 1, paragraph 8 * * page 2, paragraph 25 - page 4, paragraph 47 *;
 [A]  - RICHARD G GUY ET AL, "Implementation of the Ficus Replicated File System", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SUMMER USENIX CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (19900630), pages 63 - 71, XP002234187 [A] 1-23 * sections 2.5, 2.6, 3, 3.1, 3.2; pages 5,6 *
 [A]  - GEER D, "Reducing the Storage Burden via Data Deduplication", COMPUTER, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20081201), vol. 41, no. 12, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 15 - 17, XP011249422 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *
 [AP]  - MIN-YAN WANG ET AL, "The Research of Web Page De-duplication Based on Web Pages Reshipment Statement", DATABASE TECHNOLOGY AND APPLICATIONS, 2009 FIRST INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090425), ISBN 978-0-7695-3604-0, pages 271 - 274, XP031515216 [AP] 1-23 * abstract *
 [A]  - WIESMANN M ET AL, "Database replication techniques: a three parameter classification", RELIABLE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 2000. SRDS-2000. PROCEEDINGS THE 19TH IE EE SYMPOSIUM ON NURNBERG, GERMANY 16-18 OCT. 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20001016), ISBN 978-0-7695-0543-5, pages 206 - 215, XP010523961 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RELDI.2000.885408
ExaminationUS2003037094
    - NAGAPRAMOD MANDAGERE ET AL, "Demystifying data deduplication", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM/IFIP/USENIX MIDDLEWARE '08 CONFERENCE COMPANION : DECEMBER 1-5, 2008 LEUVEN, BELGIUM. - ACM, 2008,, (20081201), doi:10.1145/1462735.1462739, ISBN 978-1-60558-369-3, pages 12 - 17, XP002620124

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1462735.1462739
by applicant   - CHANG ET AL., "Bigtable: A Distributed Storage System for Structured Data", PROC. OF THE 7TH OSDI, (200611), pages 205 - 218, XP001544719