Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2384110

EP2384110 - BARLEY WITH REDUCED LIPOXYGENASE ACTIVITY AND BEVERAGE PREPARED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.03.2016
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2017New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carlsberg Breweries A/S
Ny Carlsberg Vej 100
1799 Copenhagen V / DK
For all designated states
Heineken Supply Chain B.V.
2de Weteringplantsoen 21
1017 ZD Amsterdam / NL
[2011/45]
Inventor(s)01 / SKADHAUGE, Birgitte
Lindehøjvej 31B
DK-3460 Birkerød / DK
02 / LOK, Finn
Kongshaven 15
DK-2500 Valby / DK
03 / BREDDAM, Klaus
Agertoften 31
Osted
DK-4000 Roskilde / DK
04 / OLSEN, Ole
Holmbladsgade 102
2.tv.
DK-2300 Copenhagen S / DK
05 / BECH, Lene Mølskov
Liljehaven 83
DK-2765 Smørum / DK
06 / KNUDSEN, Søren
Bakkesvinget 18
DK-2760 Måløv / DK
 [2011/45]
Representative(s)Høiberg P/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2016/16]Høiberg A/S
St. Kongensgade 59 A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2011/45]Høiberg A/S
St. Kongensgade 59 A
DK-1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date09801148.928.12.2009
[2016/16]
WO2009DK50355
Priority number, dateDK2008000185130.12.2008         Original published format: DK 200801851
[2011/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010075860
Date:08.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2384110
Date:09.11.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010
[2011/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2384110
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP14.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/10, C12C1/18, C12C7/00, C12C12/00, C12N15/01
[2011/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
Extension statesAL16.01.2012
BA16.01.2012
RS16.01.2012
TitleGerman:GERSTE MIT REDUZIERTER LIPOXYGENASE AKTIVITÄT UND EIN DAMIT HERGESTELLTES GETRÄNK[2013/14]
English:BARLEY WITH REDUCED LIPOXYGENASE ACTIVITY AND BEVERAGE PREPARED THEREFROM[2011/45]
French:ORGE À ACTIVITÉ RÉDUITE EN LIPOXYGÉNASE ET UNE BOISSON PRODUITE À PARTIR DE CETTE ORGE[2011/45]
Former [2011/45]GERSTE MIT VERRINGERTER LIPOXYGENASEAKTIVITÄT UND HIERMIT HERGESTELLTES GETRÄNK
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase01.08.2011National basic fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/08]
17.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2013Fee for grant paid
10.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.01.2017   
Then, Christoph/Tippe R./Arb. b. Land. AbL./AG der Umw. i. d. EKD (AGU)/Arche Noah/Bund Naturschutz/ Brot f.d. Welt/Campact/Ev
Gen-ethis. Netzwerk/IG Nachbau/Noah/ProSpecieRara/
Slow Food Deutschland/Umweltinstitut München/
Verband Katholisches Landvolk
Frohschammerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
 [2017/10]
11.05.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
20.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
[2017/11]
Former [2017/10]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
Former [2017/09]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
Former [2016/52]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005204437  (BREDDAM KLAUS [DK], et al) [X] 1-14,25-43 * paragraph [0190]; claim - *;
 [X]WO2004011591  (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-14,25-43 * page 4, line 6 - line 12 * * page 5, line 21 - line 26 * * page 10, line 5 - line 8; examples 3-4; claim 17; tables 4, 7 *;
 [X]WO02053721  (CARLSBERG RES LAB [DK], et al) [X] 1-14,25-43 * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 7; example 1 * * page 21, line 15 - page 23, line 2; example 6; claims 25-26; tables 3-7 *;
 [A]US2003167544  (DOUMA ANNA CHRISTINA [NL], et al) [A] 1-54 * paragraphs [0101] - [0119] *;
 [A]US2007067871  (WU KUNSHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-54 * paragraphs [0043] - [0044] *;
 [A]US2006005276  (FALCO SAVERIO C [US], et al) [A] 1-54 * paragraph [0689] *;
 [X]  - HIROTA N ET AL, "Brewing performance of malted lipoxygenase-1 null barley and effect on the flavor stability of beer", CEREAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CEREAL CHEMISTS. MINNEAPOLIS, US, (20060501), vol. 83, no. 3, ISSN 0009-0352, pages 250 - 254, XP009124704 [X] 1-14,25-43 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/CC-83-0250
 [T]  - HOTZEL HELMUT ET AL, "Recovery and characterization of residual DNA from beer as a prerequisite for the detection of genetically modified ingredients", EUROPEAN FOOD RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 209, no. 3-4, ISSN 1438-2377, pages 192 - 196, XP002635202

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002170050478
 [A]  - HIROTA N ET AL, "Characterization of lipoxygenase-1 null mutants in barley", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BREEDING RESEARCH, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20051101), vol. 111, no. 8, ISSN 1432-2242, pages 1580 - 1584, XP019322107 [A] 1-54 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-005-0088-y
 [A]  - KURODA H ET AL, "Characterization of factors that transform linoleic acid into di- and trihydroxyoctadecenoic acids in mash", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020101), vol. 93, no. 1, ISSN 1389-1723, pages 73 - 77, XP002980834 [A] 1-54 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MECHELEN VAN J R ET AL, "MOLECULAR CHARACTERIZATION OF TWO LIPOXYGENASES FROM BARLEY", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, (19990401), vol. 39, no. 6, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 1283 - 1298, XP001015731 [A] 1-54 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006118003998
 [A]  - RUTGERSSON A ET AL, "OPTIMIZATION OF TEMPERATURE, TIME, AND LACTIC ACID CONCENTRATION TOINACTIVATE LIPOXYGENASE AND LIPASE AND PRESERVE PHYTASE ACTIVITY INBARLEY (CV. BLENHEIM) DURING SOAKING", CEREAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CEREAL CHEMISTS. MINNEAPOLIS, US, (19970101), vol. 74, no. 6, ISSN 0009-0352, pages 727 - 732, XP000867116 [A] 1-54 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HUGUES MIREILLE ET AL, "Two Lipoxygenases from Germinated Barley-Heat and Kilning Stability", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 59, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1147, pages 885 - 889, XP002552212 [A] 1-54 * page 888 - page 889 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1994.tb08150.x
 [A]  - WAN HENG WANG ET AL, "Molecular basis of a null mutation in soybean lipoxygenase 2: substitution of glutamine for an iron-ligand histidine", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19940101), vol. 91, no. 13, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5828 - 5832, XP002175448 [A] 1-54 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.13.5828
 [A]  - DROST B W ET AL, "FLAVOR STABILITY", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BREWING CHEMISTS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BREWING CHEMISTS, ST PAUL, MN, US, (19900101), vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0361-0470, pages 124 - 131, XP000926610 [A] 1-54 * page 129, column 1, paragraph l - page 130, column 1, paragraph l *
Examination   - WACKERBAUER K ET AL, "Free and triglyceride-bonded hydroxy fatty acids in barley and malt. I. Influence of variety, provenance and harvest year", MONATSSCHRIFT FUER BRAUWISSENSCHAFT, CARL, NUERNBERG, DE, (20020101), vol. 55, no. 3/4, ISSN 0723-1520, pages 52 - 57, XP009163128
by applicantWO02053721
 WO2005087934
 EP1609866
 US7420105
 US4683195
 US4800159
    - "Approved methods of the American Association of Cereal Chemists", AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CEREAL CHEMISTS, (1995),
    - "Methods of analysis of the American Society of Brewing Chemists", American Society of Brewing Chemists, (1992),
    - BAUR, C.; GROSCH. W., "Investigation about the taste of di-, tri- and tetrahydroxy fatty acids", Z. LEBENSM. UNTERS. FORSCH., (1977), vol. 165, pages 82 - 84,
    - BAUR, C. ET AL., "Enzymatic oxidation of linoleic acid: Formation of bittertasting fatty acids", Z. LEBENSM. UNTERS. FORSCH., (1977), vol. 164, pages 171 - 176,
    - BRIGGS, D.E. ET AL., Malting and brewing science. Volume I Malt and sweet wort, CHAPMAN AND HALL, (1981),
    - DROST, B.W. ET AL., "Role of individual compounds in beer staling", TECH. Q. MBAA, (1974), vol. 11, pages 127 - 134,
    - DURAI, S. ET AL., "Zinc finger nucleases: custom-designed molecular scissors for genome engineering of plant and mammalian cells", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1093/NAR/GKI912, pages 5978 - 5990, XP002511419

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKI912
    - "Analytica - EBC", EUROPEAN BREWERY CONVENTION, (1998),
    - GROENQVIST, A. ET AL., "Carbonyl compounds during beer production in beer", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 24TH EBC CONGRESS, (1993), pages 421 - 428,
    - HAMBERG, M., "Trihydroxyoctadecenoic acids in beer: Qualitative and quantitative analysis", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1991), vol. 39, pages 1568 - 1572,
    - HANSEN, M. ET AL., "Antisense-mediated suppression of C-hordein biosynthesis in the barley grain results in correlated changes in the transcriptome, protein profile, and amino acid composition", J. EXP. BOT., (2007), vol. 58, pages 3987 - 3995,
    - HOUGH, J.S. ET AL., Malting and brewing science. Volume II Hopped wort and beer, CHAPMAN AND HALL, (1982),
    - LIDA, S.; TERADA, R., "Modification of endogenous natural genes by gene targeting in rice and other higher plants", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (2005), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1007/s11103-005-2162-x, pages 205 - 219, XP019262756

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11103-005-2162-x
    - "Institute of Brewing. Methods of analysis", INSTITUTE OF BREWING, (1997),
    - JAMIESON, A.M.; VAN GHELUWE, J.E.A., "Identification of a compound responsible for cardboard flavor in beer", PROC. AM. SOC. BREW. CHEM., (1970), vol. 29, pages 192 - 197,
    - KLEINHOFS, A. ET AL., "Induction and selection of specific gene mutations in Hordeum and Pisum", MUT. RES., (1978), vol. 51, doi:doi:10.1016/0027-5107(78)90005-2, pages 29 - 35, XP023441314

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0027-5107(78)90005-2
    - KUMAR, S. ET AL., "Gene targeting in plants: fingers on the move", TRENDS PLANT SCI., (2006), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tplants.2006.02.002, pages 159 - 161, XP028013270

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tplants.2006.02.002
    - KURODA, H. ET AL., "Characterization of factors involved in the production of 2(E)-nonenal during mashing", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2003), vol. 67, doi:doi:10.1271/bbb.67.691, pages 691 - 697, XP002990850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.67.691
    - KURODA, H. ET AL., "Characterization of 9-fatty acid hydroperoxide lyase-like activity in germinating barley seeds that transforms 9(S)-hydroperoxy-10(E).12(Z)-octadecadienoic acid into 2(E)-nonenal", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 69, pages 1661 - 1668,
    - LERMUSIEAU, G. ET AL., "Nonoxidative mechanism for development of trans-2-nonenal in beer", J. AM. SOC. BREW. CHEM., (1999), vol. 57, pages 29 - 33,
    - LIEGEOIS, C. ET AL., "Release of deuterated (E)-2-nonenal during beer aging from labeled precursors synthesized before boiling", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2002), vol. 50, pages 7634 - 7638,
    - MAQUAT, L.E.; CARMICHAEL, G.G., "Quality control of mRNA function", CELL, (2001), vol. 104, pages 173 - 176,
    - MEILGAARD, M.C., "Flavor chemistry of beer: Part II: Flavor and threshold of 239 aroma volatiles", TECH. Q. MBAA, (1975), vol. 12, pages 151 - 167,
    - MENDELL, J.T.; DIETZ, H.C., "When the message goes awry: Disease-producing mutations that influence mRNA content and performance", CELL, (2002), vol. 107, pages 411 - 414,
    - "Resources for Breeding of Wild Barley", NEVO, E., Barley: Genetics. Biochemistry. Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, C.A.B. INTERNATIONAL., (1992), pages 3 - 18,
    - NOORDERMEER, M.A. ET AL., "Fatty acid hydroperoxide lyase: A plant cytochrome P450 enzyme involved in wound healing and pest resistance", CHEMBIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 2, pages 494 - 504,
    - NYBORG, M. ET AL., "Investigations of the protective mechanism of sulfite against beer staling and formation of adducts with trans-2-nonenal", J. AM. SOC. BREW. CHEM., (1999), vol. 57, pages 24 - 28, XP002944190
    - RASMUSSEN, S.K.; HATZACK, F., "Identification of two low-phytate barley (Hordeum vulgare L.) grain mutants by TLC and genetic analysis", HEREDITAS, (1998), vol. 129, pages 107 - 112,
    - ROBBINS, M.P. ET AL., "Gene manipulation of condensed tannins in higher plants", PLANT PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 116, pages 1133 - 1144,
    - SAMBROOK, J.; RUSSELL. D.W., Molecular Cloning. A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001),
    - SCHMITT, N.F.; VAN MECHELEN. J.R., "Expression of lipoxygenase isoenzymes in developing barley grains", PLANT SCI., (1997), vol. 128, pages 141 - 150,
    - STAHL, Y. ET AL., "Antisense downregulation of the barley limit dextrinase inhibitor modulates starch granule sizes distribution. starch composition and amylopectin structure", PLANT J., (2004), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-313X.2004.02159.x, pages 599 - 611, XP002297308

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-313X.2004.02159.x
    - TZFIRA, T.; WHITE. C., "Towards targeted mutagenesis and gene replacement in plants", TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tibtech.2005.10.002, pages 567 - 569, XP025290730

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2005.10.002
    - "Diversity in barley (Hordeum vulgare)", VON BOTHMER, R. ET AL., Diversity in Barley (Hordeum vulgare), (2003), pages 129 - 136,
    - WACKERBAUER, K.; MEYNA, S., "Freie und triglyceride-gebundene Hydroxyfettsauren in Gerste und Malz", MONATSSCHRIFT FUR BRAUWISSENSCHAFT, (2002), vol. 3/4, pages 52 - 57,
    - WU, J. ET AL., "Nonsense-mediated mRNA decay (NMD) silences the accumulation of aberrant trypsin proteinase inhibitor mRNA in Nicotiana attenuata", PLANT J., (2007), vol. 51, pages 693 - 706,