blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2384110 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2384110



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1378
17.09.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.09.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 4
03.05.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
03.05.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.05.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.04.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 27
23.04.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
23.04.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
17.04.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
17.04.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
07.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.03.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.03.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.02.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.02.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
25.02.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 5
22.02.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.02.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.02.2019 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
18.02.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.12.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.12.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
21.12.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
21.12.2018 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 131
21.12.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 21
21.12.2018 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.12.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.12.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.12.2018 Means of redress Opposition 2
21.12.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
21.12.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.12.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.12.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 74
21.12.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.10.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
21.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.09.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.09.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.09.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
31.08.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Claims Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Claims Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Claims Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Claims Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Claims Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Claims Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Claims Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Claims Opposition 3
02.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.08.2018 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 18
01.08.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.02.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
22.02.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.02.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.02.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.09.2017 Annex Opposition 28
14.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.09.2017 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
11.05.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.05.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.02.2017 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
09.02.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
19.01.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
21.12.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
12.08.2016 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.03.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
24.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
08.01.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
10.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.12.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.12.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
10.12.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
10.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.08.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.08.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 152
27.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.06.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
27.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.06.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
06.06.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
06.06.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
08.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.02.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 88
08.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.02.2013 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 2
08.02.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.02.2013 Sequence listing Search / examination 38
24.10.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.10.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.02.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
17.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.02.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
17.02.2012 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 14
17.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.01.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.11.2011 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
01.11.2011 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
17.10.2011 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
12.10.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.10.2011 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
05.10.2011 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.10.2011 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.10.2011 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
05.10.2011 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
05.10.2011 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
05.10.2011 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
05.10.2011 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.10.2011 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.10.2011 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.10.2011 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
04.10.2011 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.09.2011 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.09.2011 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.08.2011 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.08.2011 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.08.2011 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
24.08.2011 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
22.08.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
17.08.2011 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
28.07.2011 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
21.07.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
14.07.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
14.07.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
27.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.06.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
27.06.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
27.06.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
27.06.2011 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 2
27.06.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.06.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
22.06.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
20.05.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
20.05.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
20.05.2011 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 6
13.05.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 96
13.07.2010 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 6
08.07.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 120
28.12.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.12.2009 Annex International Searching Authority 1
28.12.2009 Annex International Searching Authority 1
28.12.2009 Annex International Searching Authority 2
28.12.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 8
28.12.2009 Description International Searching Authority 87
28.12.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 24
28.12.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 1