blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2384110


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.04.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
24.04.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
27.02.2019 New entry: Appeal number
27.02.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
22.02.2019 Change: Appeal number
20.02.2019 New entry: Appeal number
20.02.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
20.12.2018 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
20.12.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
19.09.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
05.09.2018 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
02.03.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
19.09.2017 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
10.05.2017 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
08.04.2017 Deletion: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
29.03.2017 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
03.02.2017 Opposition filed published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
18.03.2016 (Expected) grant published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
24.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.12.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.12.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.06.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.06.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.03.2013 Change - German title published on  03.04.2013  [2013/14]
11.02.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.10.2012 First examination report
23.10.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.02.2012 Amendment by applicant
27.01.2012 Change - extension states published on  29.02.2012  [2012/09]
26.01.2012 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
20.01.2012 Request for examination filed published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
20.01.2012 Change - designated states published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
25.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.10.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]
04.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
04.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
29.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
06.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
06.07.2011 Amendment by applicant
27.06.2011 New entry: Biological material
17.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
20.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
09.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
29.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication