Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2365920

EP2365920 - EXTENDABLE DEVICE FOR ACCESSING A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.02.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Faiveley Transport
143 Boulevard Anatole France Carrefour Pleyel
93200 Saint Denis / FR
[2011/38]
Inventor(s)01 / CARRION ESPELTA Juan
c/Pav Casais n° 12
Les Boryes Del Camp / ES
02 / CASTELLNOU RIBAU Alex
c/Monsterret Roiq 5B
Reus / ES
 [2011/38]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[2015/31]
Former [2011/38]Pichat, Thierry
Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date09801227.111.12.2009
WO2009FR01418
Priority number, dateFR2008000698812.12.2008         Original published format: FR 0806988
[2011/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010066971
Date:17.06.2010
Language:FR
[2010/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2365920
Date:21.09.2011
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010
[2011/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2365920
Date:29.07.2015
Language:FR
[2015/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:B60R3/02, B61D23/02, B61D23/00, A61G3/06
[2011/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSZIEHBARE VORRICHTUNG FÜR ZUGANG ZU EINEM FAHRZEUG[2011/38]
English:EXTENDABLE DEVICE FOR ACCESSING A VEHICLE[2011/38]
French:DISPOSITIF DEPLOYABLE POUR L'ACCES A UN VEHICULE[2011/38]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2011National basic fee paid 
17.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/38]
20.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2015Fee for grant paid
15.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.04.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.04.2016  03.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Gebr. Bode GmbH & Co. KG
Ochshäuser Strasse 14
34123 Kassel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kayser, Martin
Patentanwälte
Bauer Vorberg Kayser
Partnerschaft mbB
Goltsteinstrasse 87
50968 Köln / DE
 [2016/23]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
07.06.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.12.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
26.02.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.02.2018Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition23.04.2018Appeal received No.  T1022/18
26.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.12.2009
AT29.07.2015
BG29.07.2015
CY29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
GR29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
MK29.07.2015
MT29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
SM29.07.2015
TR29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
GB11.12.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]HU11.12.2009
AT29.07.2015
BG29.07.2015
CY29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
GR29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
MT29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
SM29.07.2015
TR29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
GB11.12.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/47]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
GB11.12.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/46]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
IE11.12.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
LU11.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/23]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/21]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/14]AT29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT29.07.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0416539  (KAESSBOHRER FAHRZEUG KARL [DE]) [X] 1,2,15 * column 7, line 26 - column 8, line 13 * * column 9, lines 5-39 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO0012039  (PASSENGER LIFT SERVICES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,13,15 * page 7, line 22 - page 9, line 25 * * figures 1,4,5,7,8 *;
 [X]DE4441929  (MAUCHER MASCHINENTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,15 * column 3, lines 9-28 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 2 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2006245883  (FONTAINE YVES [CA], et al) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0030] * * figures 3-5 *;
 [A]DE10043561  (LOHMANN APPBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9,12 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * * figure 5 *
OppositionEP0416539
 WO0012039
 DE4441929
 US2006245883
 DE10043561
 DE385243
 EP0114265
 DE2620684
    - Merkmalsgliederung des Anspruchs 1
    - "Lieferschein", Trittschiene M. Klap- pe, vollst. der Einsprechenden
    - Rechnung
    - Zahlungsavis
    - M. KLAPPE, Konstruktionszeichnung zu Trittschiene
    - Vergrößerung der Legende von Anlage 11
    - Lieferschein
    - Konstruktionszeichnung zu Schiebetritt
    - dreidimensionale Darstellung der Trittschiene und des Schiebetritts, vollst