Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2312564

EP2312564 - MULTI-PRIMARY COLOR DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.12.2013
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2013Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.01.2014  [2014/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2011/16]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIYAZAKI, Akido
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha, 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / TOMIZAWA, Kazunari
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha, 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
03 / NAKAMURA, Kozo
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha, 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
04 / UEKI, Shun
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha, 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
 [2011/16]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J. , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/16]Goddar, Heinz J. , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date09802670.123.07.2009
[2011/16]
WO2009JP03485
Priority number, dateJP2008019388928.07.2008         Original published format: JP 2008193889
[2011/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010013421
Date:04.02.2010
Language:JA
[2010/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2312564
Date:20.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.02.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/20, G02F1/133, G09G5/02, H04N9/30, H04N9/64
[2011/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/16]
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN PRIMÄRFARBEN[2011/16]
English:MULTI-PRIMARY COLOR DISPLAY DEVICE[2011/16]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À MULTIPLES COULEURS PRIMAIRES[2011/16]
Entry into regional phase27.01.2011Translation filed 
27.01.2011National basic fee paid 
27.01.2011Search fee paid 
27.01.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
27.01.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/16]
09.12.2013Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1931127  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0159]; figures 1-18 *;
 [X]US2007063946  (NAKAMURA KOZO [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0155]; figures 1-29F *
International search[A]WO2007032133  (SHARP KK [JP], et al);
 [A]WO2007097080  (SHARP KK [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2003295812  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD)
by applicantJP2004529396
 JP2005523465
 WO2007032133
 JP2004062146
 JP2004078157
 JP2008193889