Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2310122

EP2310122 - METALLIC CLAY BASED FCC GASOLINE SULFUR REDUCTION ADDITIVE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saudi Arabian Oil Company
P.O. Box 5000
Dhahran 31311 / SA
For all designated states
King Fahd University Of Petroleum&Minerals
Kfupm Box 807
Dhahran 31261 / SA
[2016/34]
Former [2011/16]For all designated states
Saudi Arabian Oil Company
R-3302, North Administration Building P.O. Box 5000
Dhahran, 31311 / SA
For all designated states
King Fahd University Of Petroleum&Minerals
Kfupm Box 807
Dhahran 31261 / SA
Inventor(s)01 / BOURANE, Abdennour
P.O. Box 1634
Saudi Aramco
Dhahran 31311 / SA
02 / KOSEOGLU, Omer, Refa
P.O. Box 62
Saudi Aramco
Dhahran 31311 / SA
03 / AL-GHRAMI, Musaed, Salem
P.O. Box 10587
Saudi Aramco
Dhahran 31311 / SA
04 / DEAN, Christopher, F.
P.O. Box 05698
Saudi Aramco
Dhahran 31311 / SA
05 / SIDDIQUI, Mohammed, Abdul, Bari
Kfupm Box 807
Dhahran 31261 / SA
06 / AHMED, Shakeel
Kfupm Box 807
Dhahran 31261 / SA
 [2017/21]
Former [2011/16]01 / BOURANE, Abdennour
P.O. Box 1634 Saudi Aramco
Dhahran 31311 / SA
02 / KOSEOGLU, Omer, Refa
P.O. Box 62 Saudi Aramco
Dhahran 31311 / SA
03 / AL-GHRAMI, Musaed, Salem
P.O. Box 10587 Saudi Aramco
Dhahran 31311 / SA
04 / DEAN, Christopher, F.
P.O. Box 05698 Saudi Aramco
Dhahran 31311 / SA
05 / SIDDIQUI, Mohammed, Abdul, Bari
Kfupm Box 807
Dhahran 31261 / SA
06 / AHMED, Shakeel
Kfupm Box 807
Dhahran 31261 / SA
Representative(s)Cockerton, Bruce Roger
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2017/21]
Former [2011/16]Cockerton, Bruce Roger
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date09803284.030.07.2009
[2011/16]
WO2009US04433
Priority number, dateUS20080137471P30.07.2008         Original published format: US 137471 P
[2011/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010014256
Date:04.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2310122
Date:20.04.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010
[2011/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2310122
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.02.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01J21/06, C10G11/18, C10G11/02
[2015/04]
Former International [2011/16]B01J21/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/21]
Former [2011/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:AUF METALLISCHEM TON BASIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ALS SCHWEFELREDUKTIONSZUSÄTZE FÜR KRACKBENZIN[2011/16]
English:METALLIC CLAY BASED FCC GASOLINE SULFUR REDUCTION ADDITIVE COMPOSITIONS[2011/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS D'ADDITIF DE RÉDUCTION DE LA QUANTITÉ DE SOUFRE DANS L'ESSENCE DE FCC À BASE D'ARGILE MÉTALLIQUE[2011/16]
Entry into regional phase11.02.2011National basic fee paid 
11.02.2011Search fee paid 
11.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/16]
15.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2017Fee for grant paid
12.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17169765.9  / EP3222345
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.04.2016
Opposition(s)27.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2009
AT24.05.2017
CY24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
MK24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
IE30.07.2017
LU30.07.2017
MT30.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU30.07.2009
AT24.05.2017
CY24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
IE30.07.2017
LU30.07.2017
MT30.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2019/31]HU30.07.2009
AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
IE30.07.2017
LU30.07.2017
MT30.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2019/30]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
IE30.07.2017
LU30.07.2017
MT30.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/43]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
IE30.07.2017
LU30.07.2017
MT30.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/34]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
IE30.07.2017
LU30.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/25]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/21]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US5095161  (ABREVAYA HAYIM [US], et al) [X] 1,3-13 * column 3, line 25 - line 63; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2004071656  (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-13 * claims 1,9,17,20 *;
 [X]EP1179581  (CHINA PETROCHEMICAL CORP [CN], et al) [X] 1,3-13 * claims 1,8 *;
 [X]WO0012450  (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3-13 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9920712  (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3-13 * claims 1,2 *;
 [X]US4490569  (CHU YUNG F [US], et al) [X] 1,3-13 * column 2, line 55 - line 58; claim 1 *;
 [X]US2004266608  (LONG JUN [CN], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0062] - [0064]; example 5; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2005090523  (GRACE W R & CO [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0040] , [0051] - [0053] - [0056] , [0058] , [0059]; claims 15,18,30,31,37,48-51 *;
 [X]US2005121362  (VIERHEILIG ALBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0022] , [0054] - [0077]; claims 1,2,4,6,8,9,13 *
International search[X]US2004266608  (LONG JUN [CN], et al);
 [Y]US6090274  (WU AN-HSIANG [US], et al)
 [X]  - SIDDIQUI ET AL., "Sulfur reduction in FCC gasoline using catalyst additives.", APPLIED CATALYSIS, (2006), vol. 303, pages 116 - 120, XP025142223

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcata.2006.02.012