Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2484074 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2484074



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 844
06.12.2016 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 14
18.07.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.07.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.11.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 19
16.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.09.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.04.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.04.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
09.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
11.03.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
05.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
17.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
17.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 82
17.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 132
17.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.11.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
17.11.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
17.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
17.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
17.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
17.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
17.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
17.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
27.06.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.05.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
15.05.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
15.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.01.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.01.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.01.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.01.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
04.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.10.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
04.10.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
04.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.07.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.05.2012 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
20.04.2012 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
22.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.03.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.03.2012 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.02.2012 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.02.2012 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
07.02.2012 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
07.04.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
07.04.2011 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 24
27.05.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
27.05.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
27.05.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
22.12.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.12.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 5
22.12.2009 Description International Searching Authority 13
22.12.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 5