Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2484074


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
11.08.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
02.12.2016 Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
19.08.2016 Opposition withdrawn published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
17.08.2016 New entry: Termination of opposition procedure: despatch of decision
08.08.2016 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
27.07.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
03.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2016  [2016/27]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
11.11.2015 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
09.10.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
11.09.2015 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
24.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
19.06.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
30.04.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Change - applicant published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
07.03.2015 Change - representative
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
21.11.2014 Opposition filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
14.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
17.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
23.05.2014 (Expected) grant published on  25.06.2014  [2014/26]
20.05.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.05.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.05.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.01.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.01.2014 Change - classification published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
17.01.2014 Change - classification published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
09.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.11.2013 Change - classification published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
22.11.2013 Change - classification published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
09.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.12.2012 Change - extension states published on  09.01.2013  [2013/02]
05.10.2012 Amendment by applicant
06.07.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.08.2012  [2012/32]
06.07.2012 Request for examination filed published on  08.08.2012  [2012/32]
28.04.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.04.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2012 Amendment by applicant
09.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
22.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
06.02.2010 PCT data prior to European publication