Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2484074
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019342134Global Dossier 07.11.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201916518848 22.07.2019
US24708609 30.09.2009
US201615249125 26.08.2016
US201213498195 26.03.2012
US201715816426 17.11.2017
WO2009SE51484 22.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014092837Global Dossier 03.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
US201213498195 26.03.2012
US201314042892 01.10.2013
WO2009SE51484 22.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10411927Global Dossier 10.09.2019B2
US2018076995 15.03.2018A1
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
US201615249125 26.08.2016
US201715816426 17.11.2017
WO2009SE51484 22.12.2009
US200913498195 22.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9853848Global Dossier 26.12.2017B2
US2016366000 15.12.2016A1
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
US201615249125 26.08.2016
US201213498195 26.03.2012
WO2009SE51484 22.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9462484Global Dossier 04.10.2016B2
US2012182958 19.07.2012A1
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
WO2009SE51484 22.12.2009
US200913498195 22.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5580899BGlobal Dossier 27.08.2014B2
JP2013507035 28.02.2013A
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
WO2009SE51484 22.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2484074Global Dossier 25.06.2014B1
EP2484074 08.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
WO2009SE51484 22.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102598611B 12.08.2015B
CN102598611 18.07.2012A
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
WO2009SE51484 22.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105472747B 08.03.2019B
CN105472747 06.04.2016A
Priority number Date
CN200980161844 22.12.2009
US24708609 30.09.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2499715T 29.09.2014T3
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
WO2009SE51484 22.12.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2012003399 10.04.2012A
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
WO2009SE51484 22.12.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011040852Global Dossier 07.04.2011A1
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1223484 28.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2484074E 02.10.2014E
Priority number Date
US24708609 30.09.2009