Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2484074

EP2484074 - RECONFIGURATION OF ACTIVE COMPONENT CARRIER SET IN MULTI-CARRIER WIRELESS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Optis Wireless Technology, LLC
P.O. Box 250649
Plano, TX 75025 / US
[2015/22]
Former [2012/32]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / PELLETIER, Ghyslain
2055 rue De Valmont
Chomeye Laval, QC H/M 3J3 / CA
02 / SUNDSTRÖM, Lars
Hardeberga 381
S-247 12 Södra Sandby / SE
 [2012/32]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/32]Svanberg, Anna Charlotta
Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date09804080.122.12.2009
WO2009SE51484
Priority number, dateUS20090247086P30.09.2009         Original published format: US 247086 P
[2012/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011040852
Date:07.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2484074
Date:08.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011
[2012/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2484074
Date:25.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, H04L5/00, // H04L27/26
[2013/52]
Former International [2012/32]H04L27/26, H04W76/04, H04W72/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUKONFIGUIERUNG EINES AKTIVEN KOMPONENTENTRÄGERSETS IN DRAHTLOSEN MEHRTRÄGERSYSTEMEN[2012/32]
English:RECONFIGURATION OF ACTIVE COMPONENT CARRIER SET IN MULTI-CARRIER WIRELESS SYSTEMS[2012/32]
French:RECONFIGURATION DE PORTEUSES DE COMPOSANT ACTIVES DANS DES SYSTÈMES SANS FIL À PORTEUSES MULTIPLES[2012/32]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2012National basic fee paid 
22.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/32]
04.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2014Fee for grant paid
15.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.11.2014  11.08.2016  WITHDRAWN
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Opponent's representative
Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
 [2016/38]
Former [2014/52]
Opponent(s)01  17.11.2014  20.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Opponent's representative
Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
30.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.08.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.05.2017
22.08.2016Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
01.09.2016Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2017/01]
10.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.12.2009
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MK25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2017/37]HU22.12.2009
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2017/04]HU22.12.2009
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
IT22.12.2015
Former [2016/33]HU22.12.2009
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU22.12.2009
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2016/28]BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2016/27]BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2016/22]BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2015/50]BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2015/46]BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2015/35]BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2015/30]BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
Former [2015/22]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
Former [2015/12]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY25.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2086265  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0021]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] *;
 [A]US2009047984  (GOLLAMUDI SRIDHAR [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0014] *;
 [A]WO2006105307  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8-11,15-18,23-26 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] *;
 [A]WO0051304  (TRUSTEES LELAND STANFORD JUNIO [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 22 * * page 12, line 1 - page 17, line 25; figures 4,5 *
 [A]  - ERICSSON, "DRX with Carrier Aggregation in LTE-Advanced", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-092959 DRX IN CARRIER AGGREGATION LTE-ADVANCED, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090428), no. San Francisco, USA; 20090428, XP050340753 [A] 1-30 * paragraph [2 "Drx with Carrier Aggregation"] * * paragraphs [5.1 "MAC] - [PHY interface"] *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Feasibility study for Further Advancements for E-UTRA (LTE-Advanced) (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 36.912, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090901), no. V2.1.1, pages 1 - 53, XP050381059 [A] 1-30 * paragraph [16.6.2] *
 [A]  - ERICSSON ET AL, "Text Proposal for DC-HSDPA assumptions and standards impact", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-082249 TEXT PROPOSAL FOR DC-HSDPA ASSUMPTIONS AND STANDARDS IMPACT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080523), vol. RAN WG1, no. Kansas City, USA; 20080523, XP050110541 [A] 1-30 * paragraph [4.4.1.1] *
 [A]  - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, "Issues on Carrier Aggregation for Advanced E-UTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-084443, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20081105), no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20081105, XP050317701 [A] 1,8,15,23 * paragraph [1 "Introduction"] - paragraph [2 "Transport Block Mapping"] *