Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2312896

EP2312896 - BASE STATION DEVICE, MOBILE STATION DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING COMMUNICATION METHODS USING CARRIER AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/16]COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE STATION DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD
[2017/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[2018/02]
Former [2011/16]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Shohei
c/o SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / NOGAMI, Toshizo
c/o SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
 [2018/02]
Former [2011/16]01 / YAMADA, Shohei
c/o SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / NOGAMI, Toshizo
c/o SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2018/02]
Former [2011/16]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Innere Wiener Straße 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date09804742.605.08.2009
[2011/16]
WO2009JP03757
Priority number, dateJP2008020336106.08.2008         Original published format: JP 2008203361
[2011/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010016255
Date:11.02.2010
Language:JA
[2010/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2312896
Date:20.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2312896
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.02.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, // H04L5/00
[2015/10]
Former International [2011/16]H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/02]
Former [2011/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, MOBILSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDE KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON TRÄGERAGGREGATION[2017/10]
English:BASE STATION DEVICE, MOBILE STATION DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING COMMUNICATION METHODS USING CARRIER AGGREGATION[2017/10]
French:DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE, DISPOSITIF DE STATION MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMUNICATION CORRESPONDANTS UTILISANT UNE AGGRÉGATION DE PORTEUSES[2017/10]
Former [2011/16]KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, MOBILSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN
Former [2011/16]COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE STATION DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD
Former [2011/16]SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF DE STATION MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION
Entry into regional phase21.02.2011Translation filed 
21.02.2011National basic fee paid 
21.02.2011Search fee paid 
21.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
21.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/16]
20.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2017Fee for grant paid
28.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.02.2017
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
IE05.08.2018
LU05.08.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
[2019/38]
Former [2019/33]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
IE05.08.2018
LU05.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
LU05.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/38]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1819118  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0 28] - [0031] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0089] *;
 [I]WO2007105914  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 6, line 13 - line 24 * * page 8, line 17 - line 24 * * page 12, line 20 - line 34 *;
 [I]EP1855424  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0128] , [ 130] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0135] *;
 [E]EP2262333  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [E] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] - [0 19] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0028] - [0 31] - [0032] *;
 [E]EP2312897  (SHARP KK [JP]) [E] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0117] *
 [AP]  - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, "Issues on Carrier Aggregation for Advanced E-UTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-083528 TI CARRIER AGGR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080924), no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20080924, XP050316893 [AP] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2005524359  (NOKIA CORP.);
 [Y]WO2006118414  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al)
by applicantJP2009003757