Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2328598

EP2328598 - NOVEL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ISOLATED TETRAMERIC TYPE A PROANTHOCYANADIN AND METHODS OF USE AND MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.07.2015
Database last updated on 19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phenolics, LLC
10308 Rockbrook Road
Omaha, NE 68124 / US
[2011/23]
Inventor(s)01 / TEMPESTA, Michael, S.
P.o. Box 2439
El Granada CA 94018-2439 / US
02 / GLINSKI, Jan, A.
P.o. Box 2439
El Granada CA 94018-2439 / US
03 / KILLDAY, K., Brian
P.o. Box 2439
El Granada CA 94018-2439 / US
 [2011/23]
Representative(s)Walsh, Marie Goretti
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2011/23]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date09805451.304.08.2009
[2011/23]
WO2009US52729
Priority number, dateUS20080086073P04.08.2008         Original published format: US 86073 P
[2011/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010017213
Date:11.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2328598
Date:08.06.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010
[2011/23]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
US11.02.2010
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/45, A61K36/87
[2011/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/23]
TitleGerman:NEUE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT ISOLIERTEM TETRAMEREM TYP A-PROANTHOCYANADIN SOWIE VERWENDUNGS- UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2011/23]
English:NOVEL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ISOLATED TETRAMERIC TYPE A PROANTHOCYANADIN AND METHODS OF USE AND MANUFACTURE[2011/23]
French:NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT DE LA PROANTHOCYANIDINE DE TYPE A TÉTRAMÉRIQUE ISOLÉE, ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ET DE FABRICATION[2011/23]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2011National basic fee paid 
03.03.2011Search fee paid 
03.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/23]
18.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.2013Observations by third parties
18.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
14.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/34]
30.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/34]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.08.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201204   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2013
31.08.201406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]  - KAMIYA, KOHEI ET AL, "Studies on Jamu and the medicinal resources in Indonesia. Part 4. Studies on the constituents of bark of Parameria laevigata Moldenke", CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN , 49(5), 551-557 CODEN: CPBTAL; ISSN: 0009-2363, (2001), XP002663062 [A] 1-12 * compound 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/cpb.49.551
International search[X]US2004156925  (HOWELL AMY B [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004115285  (ROHDEWALD PETER [DE]);
 [Y]US2006073220  (DAUGHERTY F J [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007104728  (OLALDE RANGEL JOSE A [VE])
other   - "Jawarish Khabas-e-Matbookh", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/154, XP003033061
    - ABU ALI IBN-E-SINA, Al-Qaanoon-fil-Tibb, vol. V, pages 75 - 76,
    - "Jawaarish Mastagi Deegar Barae Medah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. EA1C/348, XP003033062
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Ikseer Azam, vol. II, page 405,
    - "Avaarai nei", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. SK03/201, XP003033063
    - KANNUSAMY PILLAI, Chikithsa Rathna Deepam, pages 193 - 194,
    - "Madhumegha Illagam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. SK03/140, XP003033064
    - KANNUSAMY PILLAI, Chikithsa Rathna Deepam, page 154,
    - "Purnacandrodayarasah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. VS/212, XP003033065
    - rasayoga Sagara, vol. II, page 62,
    - "Hab Hindi Bara-e-Khanazeer-I", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. BA3/566A, XP003033066
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, pages 85 - 86,
    - "Paustika Gana", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK14/397, XP003033067
    - LANKAPATIRAVANA, Arkaprakasah, pages 151 - 152,
    - "Nabeez-e-tamar", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/5131, XP003033068
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, vol. 2, page 816,
    - "Sarkara loha", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. VK5/1751, XP003033069
    - NITYANA THASIDDAH, Rasaratnakarah-Rasendra khandam, vol. 2, pages 1020 - 1021,
    - "Mufarreh Bara-e-Malaikholia", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/294, XP003033060
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, Iiaaj-al-Amraaz, page 35,
    - "Arq-e-Sandal", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/2223, XP003033070
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, page 547,