Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2318075

EP2318075 - MULTIPLE DOSAGE INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Antares Pharma, Inc.
100 Charles Ewing Blvd., Suite 300
Princeton South Corporate Center
Ewing, NJ 08628 / US
[2016/39]
Former [2011/19]For all designated states
Antares Pharma, Inc.
13755 1st Avenue North Suite 100
Minneapolis, MN 55441 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COX, Janice, L.
739 Sherwood Avenue
St. Paul MN 55106 / US
02 / RUST, Matthew
369 North Glover Rd.
Hudson WI 54016 / US
03 / KRAMER, Thomas, E.
11489 Blackfoot St. NW
Coon Rapids MN 55433 / US
04 / HOEFT, Peter
24920 Olinda Trail
Lindstrom MN 55045 / US
 [2011/19]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/21]
Former [2011/19]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date09805495.005.08.2009
[2011/19]
WO2009US52835
Priority number, dateUS20080086363P05.08.2008         Original published format: US 86363 P
[2011/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010017285
Date:11.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2318075
Date:11.05.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010
[2011/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2318075
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.05.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/315, A61M5/48
[2011/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/21]
Former [2011/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:INJEKTOR MIT MEHRFACHDOSIERUNG[2011/19]
English:MULTIPLE DOSAGE INJECTOR[2011/19]
French:INJECTEUR À DOSAGE MULTIPLE[2011/19]
Entry into regional phase15.02.2011National basic fee paid 
15.02.2011Search fee paid 
15.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
15.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/19]
22.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2019Fee for grant paid
11.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19174587.6  / EP3581224
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/49]FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2007131013  (ANTARES PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 9, paragraph 3; claims 1-19 * * page 11, paragraph 3 * * page 12 - page 13 *;
 [XI]EP0730876  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042]; claims 1-5 * [I] 2,5,7,9,11-15;
 [A]WO9422507  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2006037434  (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[A]US6562006  (HJERTMAN BIRGER [SE], et al);
 [A]US6221053  (WALTERS DANIEL A [US], et al);
 [A]US6083201  (SKINKLE DAVID W [US]);
 [A]US6936032  (BUSH JR CHARLES L [US], et al);
 [A]US5304152  (SAMS BERNARD [GB]);
 [A]US6899698  (SAMS BERNARD [GB])
by applicantUS4592745
 US3790048
 US6562006
 US2004097783
 US2007088288