|
03.12.2021 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2021 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2021 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2021 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.11.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.10.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.01.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.01.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.01.2021 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2020 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2020 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2020 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2020 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
74 |
|
14.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
44 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
67 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
67 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
336 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
24.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
309 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
309 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
69 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
193 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
25 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
29 |
|
11.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
38 |
|
15.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
292 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
230 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
20 |
|
15.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.12.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.12.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
14.12.2010 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
14.12.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
14.12.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.12.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.09.2010 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
24.09.2010 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
26 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |