Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2368252 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3273
16.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
16.05.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
16.05.2017 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
09.05.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
16.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.07.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
29.07.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.07.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.07.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.07.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
28.07.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.07.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.07.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.07.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
14.04.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
30.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.03.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
18.03.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
18.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
17.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 74
14.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
14.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Claims Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Claims Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Claims Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Claims Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
14.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 44
14.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 27
14.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
14.03.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
02.03.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
01.03.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
26.01.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
26.01.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
26.01.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.01.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.12.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
30.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
17.11.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.11.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
03.11.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.11.2015 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
03.11.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
03.11.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.11.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.11.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
03.11.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.09.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
21.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
03.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 67
03.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 336
03.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 67
02.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
02.09.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
02.09.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
02.09.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
02.09.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
27.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
27.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
24.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.08.2015 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
24.08.2015 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
24.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
24.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
24.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
24.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
24.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
24.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 309
24.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 309
29.05.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.05.2015 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.05.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.05.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 15
24.04.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 39
10.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 193
10.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 69
10.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.09.2014 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 15
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 29
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 25
11.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.06.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.06.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.06.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.06.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.06.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
10.04.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.04.2014 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.11.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
25.11.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
24.10.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 38
15.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.10.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 230
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 292
15.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.10.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
15.10.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
15.10.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
25.04.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 20
15.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.04.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
15.04.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.04.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
15.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
16.01.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
07.12.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.12.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
07.12.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
07.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.12.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.12.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
06.12.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
06.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.11.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.11.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.08.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.08.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.08.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.08.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 39
30.05.2012 Annex Search / examination 1
30.05.2012 Annex Search / examination 1
30.05.2012 Annex Search / examination 1
31.01.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
31.01.2012 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
24.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.01.2012 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 25
24.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.01.2012 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
30.11.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.11.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.08.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.07.2011 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
04.07.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.06.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.06.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
24.06.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
24.06.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 26
24.06.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 26
24.06.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
24.06.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.06.2011 Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.06.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
08.06.2011 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 1
06.06.2011 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
06.06.2011 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
17.05.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 19
13.05.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 19
12.05.2011 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
01.04.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.12.2010 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
14.12.2010 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.12.2010 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.12.2010 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
14.12.2010 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
14.12.2010 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.12.2010 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.12.2010 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.12.2010 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.10.2010 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
18.10.2010 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.10.2010 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.10.2010 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.09.2010 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.09.2010 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
24.09.2010 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
24.09.2010 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
17.06.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 50
27.05.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.05.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 39
21.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
09.02.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1