Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2368252


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.03.2016 Change - representative
15.03.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
22.01.2016 Change: Appeal number
05.01.2016 New entry: Appeal number
05.01.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
03.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
04.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
04.09.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
24.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
24.04.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
12.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
11.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]
12.06.2014 Change: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.06.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.04.2014 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
25.11.2013 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
18.10.2013 Opposition filed published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
16.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
26.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]
12.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
19.04.2013 Opposition filed published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
14.12.2012 (Expected) grant published on  16.01.2013  [2013/03]
12.12.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
12.12.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.12.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.08.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.06.2012 Change - classification published on  18.07.2012  [2012/29]
26.01.2012 New entry: Observations by third parties
08.12.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.08.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.09.2011  [2011/39]
26.08.2011 Request for examination filed published on  28.09.2011  [2011/39]
19.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2011 Amendment by applicant
01.07.2011 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
24.06.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
01.06.2011 New entry: Observations by third parties
17.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
29.10.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
08.06.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
28.05.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
17.02.2010 PCT data prior to European publication