Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2368252
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017038095Global Dossier 09.02.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
US201113126247 13.05.2011
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
US201615234379 11.08.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011249783Global Dossier 13.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2012510050Global Dossier 26.04.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2368252Global Dossier 16.01.2013B1
EP2368252 28.09.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009318893 21.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2015221519 15.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
AU2009318893 24.11.2009
AU2015221519 03.09.2015
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0922491 15.12.2015A2
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2744430 27.05.2010A1
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102217001B 15.04.2015B
CN102217001 12.10.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2368252T 15.04.2013T3
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2403118T 14.05.2013T3
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1163336 26.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20130334T 31.05.2013T1
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2559836 10.08.2015C2
RU2011116098 27.12.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SIEP2368252T 31.05.2013T1
Priority number Date
EP09806118 24.11.2009
WO2009IB07549 24.11.2009
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010058288Global Dossier 23.06.2011A8
WO2010058288 27.05.2010A1
Priority number Date
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20110103396Global Dossier 20.09.2011A
Priority number Date
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IT1392217 22.02.2012B1
ITPI20080119 25.05.2010A1
Priority number Date
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2368252E 23.04.2013E
Priority number Date
ITPI20080119 24.11.2008