Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2368252

EP2368252 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ENERGY AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2012
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2016Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Piantelli, Silvia
Strada Petriccio-Belriguardo 120
53100 Siena (SI) / IT
For all designated states
Bergomi, Luigi
Via Verdi, 33
25057 Sale Marasino (BS) / IT
For all designated states
Ghidini, Tiziano
Via San Francesco, 4
25065 Lumezzane (BS) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2011/39]For all designated states
Piantelli, Silvia
Strada Petriccio-Belriguardo 120
53100 Siena (SI) / IT
For all designated states
Bergomi, Luigi
Via Verdi, 33
25057 Sale Marasino (BS) / IT
For all designated states
Ghidini, Tiziano
Via San Francesco, 4
25065 Lumezzane, (BS) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / PIANTELLI, Francesco
Strada Petriccio-Belriguardo 112
I-53100 Siena (SI) / IT
 [2011/39]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/39]Celestino, Marco
ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi Viale G. Pisano, 31
56123 Pisa / IT
Application number, filing date09806118.724.11.2009
WO2009IB07549
Priority number, dateIT2008PI0011924.11.2008         Original published format: IT PI20080119
[2011/39]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010058288
Date:27.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2368252
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010
[2011/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2368252
Date:16.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/03]
Search report(s)International search reportEP27.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:G21B3/00
[2011/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/03]
Extension statesAL24.06.2011
BA24.06.2011
RS24.06.2011
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ENERGIEERZEUGUNG UND GERÄT DAFÜR[2011/39]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING ENERGY AND APPARATUS THEREFOR[2011/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D ÉNERGIE ET SON APPAREIL[2011/39]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2011National basic fee paid 
24.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.05.2011Observations by third parties
24.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/39]
24.01.2012Observations by third parties
08.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2012Fee for grant paid
06.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.04.2013  18.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Leonardo Corporation
1331 Lincoln Road, Suite 601
Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US
Opponent's representative
Farago-Schauer, Peter Andreas, et al
FARAGO Patentanwälte
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
 02  15.10.2013  21.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
E.F.A. S.r.l.
Viale Giuseppe Mazzini, 55
00195 ROMA / IT
Opponent's representative
Farago-Schauer, Peter Andreas
FARAGO Patentanwälte
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/41]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2013  18.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Leonardo Corporation
1331 Lincoln Road, Suite 601
Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US
Opponent's representative
Farago, Peter Andreas, et al
Schieber Farago
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
 02  15.10.2013  21.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
E.F.A. S.r.l.
Viale Giuseppe Mazzini, 55
00195 ROMA / IT
Opponent's representative
Farago, Peter Andreas
Schieber Farago
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2013/47]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2013  18.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Leonardo Corporation
1331 Lincoln Road, Suite 601
Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US
Opponent's representative
Cicogna, Franco, et al
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
 02  15.10.2013   
E.F.A. S.r.l.
Viale Giuseppe Mazzini, 55
00195 ROMA / IT
Opponent's representative
Cicogna, Franco
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2013/21]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2013  18.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Leonardo Corporation
1331 Lincoln Road, Suite 601
Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US
Opponent's representative
Cicogna, Franco, et al
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
25.11.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.06.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition30.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0134/16
14.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
MK16.01.2013
MT16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SM16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
CZ24.11.2013
SK24.11.2013
HU25.11.2013
SI25.11.2013
PT25.08.2014
[2015/41]
Former [2015/35]BG16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
MK16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SM16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
CZ24.11.2013
SK24.11.2013
HU25.11.2013
SI25.11.2013
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/32]CY16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
MK16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SM16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
CZ24.11.2013
SK24.11.2013
HU25.11.2013
SI25.11.2013
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/24]CY16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SM16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
CZ24.11.2013
SK24.11.2013
HU25.11.2013
SI25.11.2013
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/02]CY16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
CZ24.11.2013
SK24.11.2013
HU25.11.2013
SI25.11.2013
PT25.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
CZ24.11.2013
SK24.11.2013
HU25.11.2013
SI25.11.2013
Former [2014/42]CY16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
CZ24.11.2013
SK24.11.2013
HU25.11.2013
SI25.11.2013
Former [2014/37]CY16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
CZ24.11.2013
SK24.11.2013
SI25.11.2013
Former [2014/33]CY16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
Former [2013/52]CY16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
Former [2013/49]EE16.01.2013
LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
Former [2013/38]LT16.01.2013
LV16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
Former [2013/35]LT16.01.2013
IS16.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT16.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO9520816  (FOCARDI SERGIO [IT], et al) [YD] 1-3,5-8,13-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE4024515  (PHILBERTH KARL [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-8,13-15 * column 2, line 32 - line 56 * * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 10 * * column 4, line 58 - line 65 * * column 5, line 7 - line 36 * * claims 2,3,6,17,20 *;
 [A]WO9635215  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1,14 * page 4, line 15 - line 23 * * page 24, line 24 - line 29 *
 [A]  AZONANO TECHNOLOGY, "Fuel Cell, Energy Storage and Solar Energy Applications for Nanomaterials and Nanoparticles", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20050802), pages 1 - 7, URL: HTTP://WWW.AZONANO.COM/DETAILS.ASP?ARTICLEID=1339, (20091020), XP002551718 [A] 1,14 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 1 *
 [A]  JASON STAIRS, "CLUSTER", NANOWORD NET, (20070225), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20070225054718/http://www.nanoword.net/library/defgen/generate.php?termid=146, (20091020), XP002551719 [A] 1,14 * the whole document *
 [A]  PHILLIPS J C, "Heuristic model for hydrogen chemisorption on transition metal clusters", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19860201), vol. 84, no. 3, ISSN 0021-9606, pages 1951 - 1952, XP008113612 [A] 1,14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.450401
ExaminationWO2009125444
by applicantWO9520316
 DE4024515
    GABBANI, MONTALBANO, PIANTELLI, VERONESI, "Large excess heat production in Ni-H systems", II NUOVO CIMENTO, (199811), vol. IIIA, no. 11,
otherWO9520816
 DE4024515
 WO2009125444
    - "Fuel Cell, Energy Storage and Solar Energy Applications for Nanomaterials and Nanoparticles, Supplier Data by Strem Chemicals", AZONANOTECHNOLOGY, (20050802), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.azonano.com/article.aspx?articleID=1339, (20091020), XP002551718
    - "Cluster", NANOWORD.NET, pages 1 - 2, XP002551719