Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2314068

EP2314068 - USING A/V DEVICE TO SEND CONTROLLED DEVICE COMMUNICATION-RELATED PARAMETERS TO PROGRAM REMOTE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.09.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
03.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saturn Licensing LLC
25 Madison Avenue
New York, NY / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/45]For all designated states
Saturn Licensing LLC
25 Madison Avenue
New York / US
Former [2011/17]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
For all designated states
Sony Electronics Inc.
1 Sony Drive
Park Ridge, NJ 07656 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HIRABAYASHI, Yoshi
13312 Caminito Cera 197
San Diego CA 92129 / US
02 / SHINTANI, Peter
15760 Camino Codorniz
San Diego CA 92127 / US
 [2011/17]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/17]McGowan, Cathrine
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date09807081.605.08.2009
[2011/17]
WO2009US52793
Priority number, dateUS2008019003412.08.2008         Original published format: US 190034
[2011/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010019421
Date:18.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2314068
Date:27.04.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010
[2011/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.05.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/44, H04N5/445
[2011/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/17]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINER A/V-VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG GESTEUERTER GERÄTEKOMMUNIKATIONSPARAMETER AN EINE PROGRAMMFERNSTEUERUNG[2011/17]
English:USING A/V DEVICE TO SEND CONTROLLED DEVICE COMMUNICATION-RELATED PARAMETERS TO PROGRAM REMOTE CONTROL[2011/17]
French:UTILISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF AUDIOVISUEL POUR ENVOYER DES PARAMÈTRES RELATIFS À UNE COMMUNICATION DE DISPOSITIF COMMANDÉ À UNE TÉLÉCOMMANDE DE PROGRAMME[2011/17]
Entry into regional phase11.02.2011National basic fee paid 
11.02.2011Search fee paid 
11.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/17]
04.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
08.12.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination15.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0890/15
08.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
21.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.06.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
29.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2001005197  (MISHRA ANIMESH [US] ET AL) [X] 1-7,9-15 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1-3 * * figures 4A-4C * [I] 8;
 [A]WO2007030181  (UNIVERSAL ELECTRONICS INC [US]; SCOTT WAYNE [US]; CHAMBERS CHRISTOPHER) [A] 1,5,12 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0147130  (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]; DONNELL EUGENE MURPHY O [US]; BOLDUC LORI R) [A] 1,5,12 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007225828  (HUANG STEVE LANPING [US] ET AL) [A] 1,5,12 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007052547  (HAUGHAWOUT JOSEPH L [US] ET AL HAUGHAWOUT JOSEPH LEE [US] ET AL) [A] 1,5,12 * abstract * * figure 9 *
International search[A]US2003107684  (CHANG MATTHEW [US], et al);
 [A]JP2006203831  (SONY CORP);
 [A]JP2004229307  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD);
 [A]KR20060117386  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR])
by applicantUS2001005197